blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1179498

EP1179498 - Sheet feeding method and device for image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.08.2007
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 09.12.2009  [2009/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/41]For all designated states
Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
Former [2002/07]For all designated states
Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Togashi, Toshifumi, c/o Ricoh Company Limited
3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
 [2002/07]
Representative(s)Senior, Alan Murray
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/50]Senior, Alan Murray
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2002/07]Senior, Alan Murray
J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date01306764.008.08.2001
[2002/07]
Priority number, dateJP2000023987108.08.2000         Original published format: JP 2000239871
JP2000029924529.09.2000         Original published format: JP 2000299245
JP2000040506329.12.2000         Original published format: JP 2000405063
JP2001007904019.03.2001         Original published format: JP 2001079040
JP2001014231311.05.2001         Original published format: JP 2001142313
[2002/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1179498
Date:13.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1179498
Date:17.12.2003
[2003/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1179498
Date:11.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.10.2003
ClassificationIPC:B65H3/52, B65H1/26
[2002/07]
CPC:
B65H1/266 (EP,US); B65H3/5223 (EP,US); B65H2301/42324 (EP,US);
B65H2301/42328 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/37]
Former [2002/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Blattzuführverfahren und Vorrichtung für eine Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung[2002/07]
English:Sheet feeding method and device for image forming apparatus[2002/07]
French:Procédé et dispositif d'alimentation en feuilles pour un appareil de formation d'images[2002/07]
Examination procedure15.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/25]
04.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.05.2006Fee for grant paid
24.05.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.07.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
12.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XYA]US5058877  (FUJIWARA HIDEHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,15,17,28-30 * column 3, line 1 - column 3, line 42; figures 6-13 * [Y] 3,10 [A] 5-7,16;
 [XYA]GB2230000  (RAWSON LIONEL E J) [X] 1,2,28-30 * page 2, line 2 - page 2, line 22; figure 1 * [Y] 3,10,15 [A] 5,6;
 [XYA]GB2195614  (RICOH KK) [X] 1,2,9,15,17,28-30 * page 3, line 71 - page 4, line 61; figures 2,6,7 * [Y] 3,10 [A] 5;
 [A]US5775688  (KATO HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,23,28-30 * column 4, line 15 - column 6, line 35; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US4674737  (MURAYOSHI SEIJI [JP]) [A] 1,2,9,10,14,15,17,28-30 * column 3, line 57 - column 9, line 51; figures 1-4,6-11,15,16 *;
 [A]JPS61291325  ;
 [A]JPS62295836  ;
 [Y]US5584475  (ASADA TETSUO [JP], et al) [Y] 3,10,15 * column 4, line 43 - column 8, line 59; figures 3,4,6,8-12 *;
 [Y]US5975518  (WAKANA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 3,10 * column 4, line 52 - column 7, line 35; figures 6-16 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870522), vol. 011, no. 158, Database accession no. (M - 591), & JP61291325 A 19861222 (CANON INC) [A] 1,2,9,15,28-30 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880528), vol. 012, no. 183, Database accession no. (M - 703), & JP62295836 A 19871223 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1,2,5,9,15,18,28-39 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.