blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1241075

EP1241075 - Torque sensor for automobiles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.08.2007
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.10.2007  [2007/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mando Corporation
343-1 Manho-Ri, Posung-Myon Pyungtaek-City
Kyungki-Do / KR
[2006/43]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
Mando Corporation
343-1 Manho-Ri, Posung-Myon
Pyungtaek-City, Kyungki-Do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Ji-Woong
1005-205, Jookong APT, Sanbon-Dong
Kunpo-City, Kyungki-DO / KR
02 / Kim, Ki-Won
343-1 Manho-Ri, Poseung-Myun
Pyungtak-City, Kyungki-Do / KR
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel, et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel, et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date01307353.130.08.2001
[2002/38]
Priority number, dateKR2001001363816.03.2001         Original published format: KR 2001013638
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1241075
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1241075
Date:17.12.2003
[2003/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1241075
Date:25.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.2003
ClassificationIPC:B62D6/10, B62D5/04, B62D6/00, G01L3/10
[2003/51]
CPC:
B62D6/10 (EP,US); G01L3/22 (KR); G01L3/104 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2002/38]B62D6/10
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/37]
Former [2002/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Drehmomentsensor für Fahrzeuge[2002/38]
English:Torque sensor for automobiles[2002/38]
French:Capteur de couple pour véhicules[2002/38]
Examination procedure21.09.2001Examination requested  [2002/38]
09.05.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2006Fee for grant paid
11.09.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.07.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
10.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
25.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0362890  (KOYO SEIKO CO [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document * * column 12, line 27 - line 39; figure 4 *;
 [A]US5796014  (CHIKARAISHI KAZUO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * * column 14, line 13 - line 42; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0814012  (KOYO SEIKO CO [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.