Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1191358

EP1191358 - Rod lens array for line scanning [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.07.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.09.2004  [2004/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd.
7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-8559 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/13]For all designated states
Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd.
7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8559 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Toyama, Minoru, c/o Nippon Sheet Glass Co. Ltd.
7-28 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8559 / JP
 [2002/13]
Representative(s)Jackson, Robert Patrick
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/13]Jackson, Robert Patrick
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date01308104.724.09.2001
[2002/13]
Priority number, dateJP2000028930622.09.2000         Original published format: JP 2000289306
JP2000030347503.10.2000         Original published format: JP 2000303475
[2002/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1191358
Date:27.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1191358
Date:04.06.2003
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:G02B3/00, G02B13/00
[2003/23]
Former International [2002/13]G02B3/00
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/09]
Former [2002/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Stablinsen-Matrix zur Zeilenabtastung[2002/13]
English:Rod lens array for line scanning[2002/13]
French:Matrice de lentilles barreaux pour balayage linéaire[2002/13]
Examination procedure05.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/38]
13.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
19.01.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
19.01.2004M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0926513  (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0023] *;
 [A]EP0786353  (ROHM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 2 * page 4 - page 5; figure 13 *