Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1257126

EP1257126 - Control system and controlling method for controlling a display device, a server and a medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.09.2011
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.09.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.10.2011  [2011/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hatanaka, Itaru, c/o Fujitsu Personal Computer
Systems Limited, 1405, Ooaza, Oomaru
Inagi-shi, Tokyo / JP
02 / Nita, Mio, c/o Fujitsu Personal Computer
Systems Limited, 1405, Ooaza, Oomaru
Inagi-shi, Tokyo / JP
03 / Nakamura, Yoshimoto, c/o Fujitsu Personal Computer
Systems Limited, 1405, Ooaza, Oomaru
Inagi-shi, Tokyo / JP
04 / Ochiai, Mikako, c/o Fujitsu Personal Computer
Systems Limited, 1405, Ooaza, Oomaru
Inagi-shi, Tokyo / JP
05 / Yanagi, Yoshiharu, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
06 / Tsutsumi, Shinji, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
07 / Kurimoto, Eiji, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
08 / Urushihara, Masashi, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
 [2002/46]
Representative(s)Fenlon, Christine Lesley , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]Fenlon, Christine Lesley , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date01308437.102.10.2001
[2002/46]
Priority number, dateJP2001013919709.05.2001         Original published format: JP 2001139197
[2002/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1257126
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1257126
Date:21.07.2004
[2004/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.06.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/24, H04N7/173, G06F17/30
[2004/12]
Former International [2002/46]H04N7/173, G06F17/30
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/15]
Former [2002/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kontrollsystem und Kontrollverfahren zur Kontrolle eines Anzeigegeräts, eines Servers und eines Aufzeichnungsmediums[2002/46]
English:Control system and controlling method for controlling a display device, a server and a medium[2002/46]
French:Système et procédé de contrôle pour contrôler un dispositif d'affichage, un serveur et un support d'enregistrement[2002/46]
Examination procedure25.10.2004Examination requested  [2004/52]
26.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/43]
09.06.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/43]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.09.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
30.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
31.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
29.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201010   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5708845  (WISTENDAHL DOUGLASS A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-9,12,15-18,46,47,51-54,57,60-63,91-93,96-99,102,105-108 * column 4, line 60 - column 9, line 15 * [Y] 4,5,49,50,94,95;
 [AY]WO9843437  (CANAL PLUS SA [FR], et al) [A] 1,46,91 * page 5, line 14 - line 16 * [Y] 4,5,24,25,49,50,69,70,94,95,114,115;
 [XY]US5918012  (ASTIZ PAUL [US], et al) [X] 21-23,26-28,30,32-36,45,66-68,71-73,75,77-81,90,111-113,116-118,120,122-126,135 * column 4, line 48 - column 5, line 25 * * column 6, line 46 - column 14, line 28 * [Y] 24,25,69,70,114,115;
 [X]WO0124052  (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [X] 21,22,29,31,66,67,74,76,111,112,119,121 * page 2, line 27 - page 7, line 10 *;
 [X]US5961603  (KUNKEL GERARD [US], et al) [X] 21,25,32,33,66,70,77,78,111,115,122,123 * column 4, line 40 - column 11, line 32 *;
 [XA]WO9910822  (VEON INC [US], et al) [X] 32-36,77-81,122-126 * page 108, line 20 - page 149, line 19 * [A] 21,39,43,44,66,88,89,111,133,134;
 [A]US6006265  (RANGAN P VENKAT [US], et al) [A] 21-24,31-38,45,66-69,76-83,90,111-114,121-128,135 * column 9, line 42 - column 11, line 59 * * column 17, line 43 - line 63 * * column 21, line 41 - column 29, line 42 *;
 [XA]US5801747  (BEDARD KAREN [US]) [X] 39,84,129 * column 2, line 6 - line 45 * * column 4, line 27 - column 7, line 6 * [A] 40,41,85,86,130,131;
 [A]WO0033160  (TELECOM PARTNERS LTD [US], et al) [A] 39-41,84-86,129-131 * page 9, line 27 - page 13, line 6 * * page 24, line 20 - page 28, line 27 * * page 37, line 7 - line 22 *;
 [X]US5929849  (KIKINIS DAN [US]) [X] 42,87,132 * column 11, line 1 - line 28 *;
 [A]US5848396  (GERACE THOMAS A [US]) [A] 43,44,88,89,134,135 * column 5, line 63 - column 7, line 37 * * column 12, line 57 - column 13, line 32 * * column 17, line 1 - line 17 *
 [X]  DAKSS J ET AL, "HYPERLINKED VIDEO", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (199911), vol. 3528, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 2 - 10, XP000986761 [X] 1,3,6,13,15,19,20,46,48,51,58,60,64,65,91,93,96,103,105,109,110 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 9, paragraph 5.3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.337394