Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1199665

EP1199665 - Terminal apparatus registration method and system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.10.2010
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.11.2010  [2010/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
Former [2002/17]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Maeda, Satoru, c/o Sony Corporation
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
02 / Onishi, Manabu, c/o Sony Corporation
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
 [2009/23]
Former [2002/17]01 / Maeda, Satoru, c/o SOny Corporation
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
02 / Onishi, Manabu, c/o Sony Corporation
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
Representative(s)Turner, James Arthur , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/51]Turner, James Arthur , et al
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2002/17]Pratt, Richard Wilson , et al
D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date01308442.103.10.2001
[2002/17]
Priority number, dateJP2000030887210.10.2000         Original published format: JP 2000308872
[2002/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1199665
Date:24.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1199665
Date:04.02.2004
[2004/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1199665
Date:25.11.2009
Language:EN
[2009/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/28
[2009/18]
Former International [2004/06]H04L12/28, G06F17/60
Former International [2002/17]G06F17/60
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/44]
Former [2002/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System für die Registrierung von einem Endgerät[2002/17]
English:Terminal apparatus registration method and system[2002/17]
French:Procédé et système pour l'enregistrement d'un terminal[2002/17]
Examination procedure19.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/38]
11.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.08.2009Fee for grant paid
27.08.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.08.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
12.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
13.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0793170  (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * page 2, column 2, line 21 - line 36 * * page 2, column 2, line 48 - page 3, column 3, line 36 * * page 3, column 4, line 26 - line 51 * * page 4, column 5, line 3 - line 42 * * page 4, column 6, line 20 - line 55 * * page 5, column 7, line 25 - line 34 * * page 5, column 8, line 4 - line 14 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]WO0014919  (N C C EXPORT SYSTEMS 1995 LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 3, line 5 - line 26 * * page 9, line 20 - line 26 * * page 11, line 2 - line 20 * * page 11, line 28 - page 12, line 20 * * page 14, line 25 - line 33 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US6012088  (LI JIM Y [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * column 3, line 8 - line 53 * * column 9, line 50 - column 10, line 24 * * column 10, line 66 - column 11, line 30 * * column 14, line 50 - column 15, line 16 * * figures 8,10-12 *;
 [A]US5862339  (BONNAURE PATRICK P [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * column 19, line 50 - column 20, line 9 * * column 20, line 26 - line 51 * * figures 17,18 *
by applicantEP0793170