Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1199036

EP1199036 - Knotless suture anchor system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/17]Knotless suture anchor system and method of use
[2006/18]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.12.2007
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DePuy Mitek, Inc.
249 Vanderbilt Avenue
Norwood MA 02062 / US
[2007/04]
Former [2002/17]For all designated states
ETHICON, INC.
U.S. Route 22 West
Somerville, NJ 08876 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lizardi, Jose E.
3 Kayla Drive
Franklin, Massachusetts 02038 / US
 [2002/17]
Representative(s)Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London
WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/17]Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date01308815.817.10.2001
[2002/17]
Priority number, dateUS2000069149818.10.2000         Original published format: US 691498
[2002/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1199036
Date:24.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1199036
Date:03.12.2003
[2003/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1199036
Date:21.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.10.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/04
[2002/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/17]
TitleGerman:Knotenloses Nähfadenankersystem[2006/18]
English:Knotless suture anchor system[2006/18]
French:Système d'ancrage de fil de suture sans noeud[2006/18]
Former [2002/17]Knotenloses Nähfadenankersystem und Anwendungsverfahren
Former [2002/17]Knotless suture anchor system and method of use
Former [2002/17]Système d'ancrage de fil de suture sans noeud et son procédé d'utilisation
Examination procedure21.05.2004Examination requested  [2004/30]
20.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.07.2006Fee for grant paid
19.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
CY21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
TR21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
GR22.05.2007
ES01.06.2007
PT23.07.2007
IE17.10.2007
LU17.10.2007
MC31.10.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
CY21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
GR22.05.2007
ES01.06.2007
PT23.07.2007
IE17.10.2007
LU17.10.2007
MC31.10.2007
Former [2009/33]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
CY21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
GR22.05.2007
ES01.06.2007
PT23.07.2007
IE17.10.2007
MC31.10.2007
Former [2008/48]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
GR22.05.2007
ES01.06.2007
PT23.07.2007
IE17.10.2007
MC31.10.2007
Former [2008/26]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
GR22.05.2007
ES01.06.2007
PT23.07.2007
MC31.10.2007
Former [2008/19]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
GR22.05.2007
ES01.06.2007
PT23.07.2007
Former [2007/48]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
ES01.06.2007
PT23.07.2007
Former [2007/46]AT21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
ES01.06.2007
Former [2007/39]CH21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
ES01.06.2007
Former [2007/38]CH21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
Former [2007/37]CH21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
Former [2007/36]FI21.02.2007
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO0051497  (BARTLETT) [X] 25-31 * abstract * * page 5, lines 13-17 * * page 17, line 24 - page 18, line 4 * [Y] 1-23;
 [Y]US5891168  (THAL) [Y] 1-23 * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 21; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US5782864  (LIZARDI) [A] 1-4,12-23 * figure - *;
 [A]WO9737595  (MITEK SURGICAL PRODUCTS, INC.) [A] 1-6,10,11 * figure - *;
 [A]US5176682  (CHOW) [A] 25 * abstract *