Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1307009

EP1307009 - A method of selecting and switching from an uplink and downlink channel combination [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.06.2004
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 12.11.2008  [2008/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/18]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Chen, Xiaoboa
17 Beech Drive
Swindon, Wiltshire SN5 5DQ / GB
02 / Richards, Derek
Whetstone Cottage, Marston Mersey
Swindon, Wiltshire SN6 6LL / GB
03 / Falaki, Hamid
2 Whitefield Cr., Peatmore
Swindon, Wiltshire SN5 5AA / GB
 [2003/18]
Representative(s)Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd
Patent Business
c/o Nokia
125 Finsbury Pavement
London EC2A 1NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/46]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield
EN3 7XU / GB
Former [2003/18]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Lucent Technologies NS UK Limted, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 OTU / GB
Application number, filing date01308988.323.10.2001
[2003/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1307009
Date:02.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/56, H04Q7/38
[2003/18]
Designated contracting states[2004/04]
Former [2003/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Auswahl und zur Umschaltung von einer Aufwärts- und Abwärtskanal-Kombination[2003/18]
English:A method of selecting and switching from an uplink and downlink channel combination[2003/18]
French:Procédé de sélection et de changement de combinaison de canaux montant et descendant[2003/18]
Examination procedure03.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/32]
02.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/32]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
15.12.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
15.12.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO0131950  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M) [X] 1-5,7-10 * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 2 * * page 5, lines 1-15 * * page 10, lines 19-22 * * page 11, lines 3-9 * * page 15, lines 1-15 * [Y] 6;
 [Y]US5943316  (DAVIS S P) [Y] 6 * column 2, lines 28-49 *;
 [X]WO9966748  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M) [X] 1-5,8-10 * page 2, line 11 - page 4, line 27 * * page 10, line 14 - page 11, line 27 *;
 [X]WO0176304  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M) [X] 1-5,8-10 * page 6, line 3 - page 8, line 4 * * page 10, line 23 - page 11, line 8 * * page 12, line 21 - page 13, line 23 * * page 15, lines 3-11 * * page 18, lines 11-23 *