blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1211919

EP1211919 - Tuner and receiver apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.2012
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip09.03.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.04.2012  [2012/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2011/18]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2002/23]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kawakami, Satoru, c/o Sony Corporation
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
 [2002/23]
Representative(s)Nicholls, Michael John
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/23]Nicholls, Michael John
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date01309443.807.11.2001
[2002/23]
Priority number, dateJP2000034198309.11.2000         Original published format: JP 2000341983
[2002/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1211919
Date:05.06.2002
Language:EN
[2002/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1211919
Date:18.09.2002
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1211919
Date:04.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.2002
ClassificationIPC:H05K1/02
[2002/23]
CPC:
H05K1/0218 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/23]
Former [2002/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Tuner und Abstimmgerät[2002/23]
English:Tuner and receiver apparatus[2002/23]
French:Circuit d'accord et récepteur[2002/23]
Examination procedure21.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/17]
31.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.03.2011Fee for grant paid
14.03.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.02.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
14.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
15.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
10.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
23.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US5483413  (BABB SAMUEL M [US]) [A] 5,6 * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]DE19649433  (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4,5,8 * column 4, line 21 - line 39; figures 1,5 * * column 5, line 50 - line 68 *;
 [A]DE19630720  (BODENSEEWERK GERAETETECH [DE]) [A] * abstract *;
 [A]EP0932252  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 5 * figure 3 *;
 [A]  - ARMSTRONG M K, "PCB DESIGN TECHNIQUES FOR LOWEST-COST EMC COMPLIANCE: PART 1", ELECTRONICS AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERING JOURNAL, INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, LONDON, GB, (199908), vol. 11, no. 4, ISSN 0954-0695, pages 185 - 194, XP000930518

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/ecej:19990402
by applicantDE19649433
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.