EP1209804 - Switching power supply circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yasumura, Masayuki, c/o Intellectual Property Dept Sony Corporation, 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Pilch, Adam John Michael, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Pilch, Adam John Michael, et al D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01309611.0 | 14.11.2001 | [2002/22] | Priority number, date | JP20000352539 | 15.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000352539 | [2002/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1209804 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1209804 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/338, H02M3/28, H02M3/335, H03K17/06, H02M7/217, H02M7/5383, G05F1/618 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
H02M3/33576 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/22] | H02M3/335 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/31] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schaltungen von Schaltnetzteilen | [2002/22] | English: | Switching power supply circuits | [2002/22] | French: | Circuits des alimentations à découpage | [2002/22] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/27] | 24.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/11] | 12.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No relevant documents disclosed |