Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1211364 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1211364



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 615
06.06.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
28.12.2009 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
15.12.2009 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 1
15.12.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 2
11.12.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.12.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
27.11.2009 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 23
24.08.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
27.07.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.07.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 17
21.07.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 18
13.07.2009 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 4
22.05.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
19.05.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.05.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 3
11.05.2009 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
11.05.2009 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
11.05.2009 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the EP procedure Search / examination 1
11.05.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.05.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
08.05.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.05.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
08.05.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
21.04.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.04.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.04.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.02.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.02.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.02.2009 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 11
27.01.2009 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
27.08.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.08.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
21.08.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
21.08.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
15.08.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 27
14.08.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 11
10.08.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.08.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 12
05.04.2007 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.03.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
27.03.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
22.02.2007 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
12.02.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
06.02.2007 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
05.02.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
05.02.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
05.02.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
22.12.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.12.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.12.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
27.11.2006 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
27.11.2006 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 10
27.11.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
09.11.2006 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2006 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.11.2006 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
06.11.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.11.2006 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
01.11.2006 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
01.11.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.11.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
16.10.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.10.2006 Claims Opposition 5
13.10.2006 Claims Opposition 5
13.10.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
10.10.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 16
14.08.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.08.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.08.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.08.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.07.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
28.07.2006 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
28.07.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.07.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.03.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.03.2006 Drawings Opposition 2
18.03.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
18.03.2006 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 14
14.03.2006 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 17
17.01.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.01.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
11.01.2006 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
14.09.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
14.09.2005 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
25.08.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
10.08.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.08.2005 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
10.08.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
10.08.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
10.08.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
10.08.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
15.12.2004 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
30.09.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.09.2004 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
15.09.2004 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
15.09.2004 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 2
30.07.2004 Description Search / examination 1
30.07.2004 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
30.07.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 7
30.07.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 7
27.07.2004 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 16
25.05.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (grant procedure) Search / examination 1
21.05.2004 Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant Search / examination 1
17.05.2004 Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant Search / examination 1
30.04.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
30.04.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
30.04.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 29
05.03.2004 Preparation of grant Search / examination 2
31.01.2004 Claims Search / examination 6
31.01.2004 Description Search / examination 4
31.01.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.01.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 12
29.12.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
16.12.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.08.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
18.08.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.07.2003 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
30.06.2003 Claims Search / examination 6
30.06.2003 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
26.06.2003 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 8
19.05.2003 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
31.03.2003 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
31.03.2003 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
31.03.2003 European search report Search / examination 1
10.02.2003 Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties Search / examination 1
07.02.2003 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
22.01.2003 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
07.10.2002 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
04.10.2002 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
23.09.2002 Urgent letter Search / examination 1
26.08.2002 Acknowledgement of receipt of observations by third party Search / examination 1
26.08.2002 Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties Search / examination 1
24.08.2002 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 6
24.08.2002 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
03.08.2002 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 12
03.08.2002 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 3
03.08.2002 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 6
03.08.2002 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
24.04.2002 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
05.02.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.12.2001 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 2
20.12.2001 Priority document Search / examination 28
12.12.2001 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
12.12.2001 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
29.11.2001 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.11.2001 Claims Search / examination 5
29.11.2001 Description Search / examination 15
29.11.2001 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.11.2001 Drawings Search / examination 9
29.11.2001 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7