Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1316379

EP1316379 - Rotary cutting blade [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.02.2005
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.04.2005  [2005/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Turbolite AG
Auf Leymen 6
4246 Wahlen / CH
[2003/23]
Inventor(s)01 / Halbeisen, Mario
Ziegelweg 6
6052 Hergiswil / CH
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Loven, Keith James
Loven
Patents & Trademarks
West Central
Runcorn Road
Lincoln LN6 3QP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Loven, Keith James
Loven & Co Quantum House 30 Tentercroft Street
Lincoln LN5 7DB / GB
Application number, filing date01310041.730.11.2001
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1316379
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:B23D61/02
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/23]
TitleGerman:Rotierend antreibbares Schneidwerkzeug[2003/23]
English:Rotary cutting blade[2003/23]
French:Outil de coupe entraîné en rotation[2003/23]
Examination procedure28.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/05]
02.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/15]
27.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200404   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4067311  (BENETELLO GIORGIO) [X] 1-3 * column 4, line 41 - line 50; figures 1,2 * [Y] 4-8;
 [X]JPH06238568  ;
 [YA]US3990338  (WIKNER GUNNAR, et al) [Y] 4 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 1 * * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 7; figures 1,2 * [A] 5;
 [YA]US4201103  (BARTSCH ULRICH [DE], et al) [Y] 5 * column 4, line 33 - line 47; figures 1-3 * [A] 4;
 [Y]US5871005  (SUETA KIMIKO [JP]) [Y] 6 * column 1, line 18 - line 26; figures 3,4 *;
 [Y]US6158323  (ASADA TANEHIKO [JP]) [Y] 7,8 * column 2, line 49 - line 53 * * column 3, line 8 - line 13; figure 2 *;
 [A]US2540793  (METZGER LEOPOLD H) [A] 1 * column 4, line 13 - line 52; figure - *;
 [A]DE2540205  (EFFGEN FA GUENTER) [A] 6 * page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph L; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE3445206  (PHILIPP PERSCH NACHF INH FRITZ [DE]) [A] 6 * page 8; figure - *;
 [A]JPH0390308
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941124), vol. 018, no. 616, Database accession no. (M - 1710), [X] 1-3 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910708), vol. 015, no. 267, Database accession no. (M - 1133), [A] 7,8 * abstract *