Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1322006

EP1322006 - Apparatus for detecting wavelength drift and method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.07.2010
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Avago Technologies Fiber IP (Singapore) Pte. Ltd.
No. 1 Yishun Avenue 7
Singapore 768923 / SG
[2006/52]
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
Agilent Technologies, Inc. (a Delaware corporation)
395 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Park, Chris
Willowtree House, Church Road, Bacton
Stowmarket, Suffolk IP14 4LJ / GB
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Leonrodstrasse 58
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/37]Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Nussbaumstrasse 6
80336 München / DE
Former [2006/22]Schoppe, Fritz , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Former [2003/26]Coker, David Graeme , et al
Agilent Technologies UK Ltd, Legal Dept, Eskdale Road, Winnersh Triangle
Wokingham, Berks RG41 5DZ / GB
Application number, filing date01310792.521.12.2001
[2003/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1322006
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1322006
Date:26.08.2009
Language:EN
[2009/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.12.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01S5/0687
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/26]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Detektierung von Wellenlängenabweichung und Verfahren[2003/26]
English:Apparatus for detecting wavelength drift and method therefor[2003/26]
French:Dispositif de détection de décalage de longueur d'onde et méthode[2003/26]
Examination procedure29.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/10]
24.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.01.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2009Fee for grant paid
03.07.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.05.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.08.2009
BE26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
IT26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
TR26.08.2009
GR27.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
GB21.12.2009
IE21.12.2009
LU21.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
CH31.12.2009
FR31.12.2009
LI31.12.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/21]AT26.08.2009
BE26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
IT26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
GR27.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
GB21.12.2009
IE21.12.2009
LU21.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
CH31.12.2009
FR31.12.2009
LI31.12.2009
Former [2011/14]AT26.08.2009
BE26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
IT26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
GR27.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
GB21.12.2009
IE21.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
CH31.12.2009
FR31.12.2009
LI31.12.2009
Former [2011/05]AT26.08.2009
BE26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
GR27.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
GB21.12.2009
IE21.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
CH31.12.2009
FR31.12.2009
LI31.12.2009
Former [2010/47]AT26.08.2009
BE26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
GR27.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
IE21.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
CH31.12.2009
FR31.12.2009
LI31.12.2009
Former [2010/46]AT26.08.2009
BE26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
GR27.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
IE21.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
Former [2010/28]AT26.08.2009
BE26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
ES07.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
Former [2010/20]AT26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
ES07.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
Former [2010/19]AT26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
ES07.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
Former [2010/16]AT26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
PT28.12.2009
Former [2010/10]AT26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
Former [2010/09]AT26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
Former [2010/08]AT26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0111739  (CORETEK INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * figure 1 *;
 [A]JPS57190387  ;
 [A]JPS5737893  ;
 [A]JPH07115248  ;
 [A]JPS63317935  ;
 [A]JPS62171174
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830215), vol. 007, no. 036, Database accession no. (E - 158), & JP57190387 A 19821122 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI KK) [A] 1-8 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820617), vol. 006, no. 107, Database accession no. (E - 113), & JP57037893 A 19820302 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,5 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 1995, no. 08, & JP07115248 A 19950502 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1,5 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890418), vol. 013, no. 159, Database accession no. (P - 858), & JP63317935 A 19881226 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,5 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880112), vol. 012, no. 009, Database accession no. (E - 572), & JP62171174 A 19870728 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,5 * abstract *