Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1236524

EP1236524 - Flange bending apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.12.2004
Database last updated on 23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.01.2005  [2005/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unova IP Corp.
21900 Burbank Boulevard Woodland Hills
CA 91367-7418 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
Unova IP Corp.
21900 Burbank Boulevard
Woodland Hills, CA 91367-7418 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Wiens, Philip V.
642 Smith Crescent
LaSalle, Ontario N9J 3G9 / CA
02 / Ross, Michael J.
8510 Lambs Road
Wales Township, MI 48027 / US
03 / Harper, Kris R.
P.O. Box 105
Three Springs, PA 17264 / US
 [2003/03]
Former [2002/36]01 / Wiens, Philip V.
642 Smith Crescent
LaSalle, Ontario N9J 3G9 / CA
02 / Ross, Michael J.
8510 Lambs Road
Wales Township, MI 48027 / US
03 / Harper, Kris R.
P.O. Box 105
Three Springs, PA 17264 / PA
Representative(s)Forsyth, Helen Jane , et al
Nash Matthews LLP
24 Hills Road
Cambridge CB2 1JP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Forsyth, Helen Jane , et al
Keith W Nash & Co, 90-92 Regent Street
Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB
Application number, filing date01310818.821.12.2001
[2002/36]
Priority number, dateUS2001079626328.02.2001         Original published format: US 796263
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1236524
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1236524
Date:08.10.2003
[2003/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.08.2003
ClassificationInternational:B21D19/08
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   SE [2004/27]
Former [2002/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Flanschbiegevorrichtung[2002/36]
English:Flange bending apparatus[2002/36]
French:Dispositif de pliage de rebords[2002/36]
Examination procedure13.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/03]
11.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2005/03]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
19.05.2004M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US6035504  (GOERGEN JOSEF [DE]) [X] 1-5,22 * column W * [A] 23;
 [X]WO9743165  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,22 * the whole document *;
 [AD]US5979208  (HARTLEY WILLIAM R [US]) [AD] 6,24 * column W *;
 [A]WO9802260  (KUKA SCHWEISSANLAGEN GMBH [DE], et al)