Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1126357

EP1126357 - Portable recording medium and method of using portable recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.12.2004
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.02.2005  [2005/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Base Technology Inc.
22-45 Nishi-Shinjuku, 7-Chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 160-0023 / JP
[2001/34]
Inventor(s)01 / Yamane, Shigeaki, c/o Base Technology, Inc
22-45 Nishi-Shinjuku, 7-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 160-0023 / JP
02 / Imajo, Tadahiro, c/o Base Technology, Inc
22-45 Nishi-Shinjuku, 7-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 160-0023 / JP
03 / Yoshida, Naokuni, c/o Base Technology, Inc
22-45 Nishi-Shinjuku, 7-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 160-0023 / JP
 [2001/34]
Representative(s)Rousset, Jean-Claude
Cabinet Netter
36, avenue Hoche
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/34]Rousset, Jean-Claude
Cabinet Netter 40, rue Vignon
75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date01400361.012.02.2001
[2001/34]
Priority number, dateJP2000003639915.02.2000         Original published format: JP 2000036399
[2001/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1126357
Date:22.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1126357
Date:29.10.2003
[2003/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.2003
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/00
[2001/34]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/30]
Former [2001/34]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Tragbares Aufzeichnungsmedium und Verfahren für Benutzung des tragbaren Aufzeichungsmediums[2001/34]
English:Portable recording medium and method of using portable recording medium[2001/34]
French:Support d'enregistrement portable et procédé d'utilisation de support d'enregistrement portable[2001/34]
Examination procedure30.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/05]
01.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2005/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
01.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
14.06.2004M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US6003135  (BIALICK WILLIAM P ET AL) [X] 1-16 * column 7, lines 1-65 * * abstract * * figure 7 * * columns 12-15 * * column 17 * * column 18 * * column 19 *;
 [A]EP0379333  (GRAVES MARCEL ALBERT) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * figure 3 * * column 2, lines 46-55 * * column 3, lines 1-50 * * column 5 * * column 6, lines 1-54 * * column 7 *;
 [A]US6012636  (SMITH FRANK E) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *