Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1245328 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1286
17.11.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
03.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
03.11.2017 Clean copy of description pages in the opposition procedure Opposition 8
03.11.2017 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
03.11.2017 French translation of claims Opposition 1
03.11.2017 German translation of the claims Opposition 1
03.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
04.08.2017 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
04.08.2017 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
04.08.2017 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
28.07.2017 OPPODREX with handwritten amendments Opposition 22
20.07.2017 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 3
14.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.07.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 35
10.07.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
10.07.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
05.07.2017 Amended description with annotations Appeal 15
05.07.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
05.07.2017 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 5
11.04.2017 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
11.04.2017 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
06.04.2017 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
28.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.03.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
23.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
23.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
23.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
23.03.2017 Claims Appeal 1
23.03.2017 Claims Appeal 1
23.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
23.03.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
16.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.03.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
24.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.11.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
21.11.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
21.11.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 6
16.11.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
17.10.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
12.07.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
06.05.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
22.04.2016 Request concerning representative opponent Search / examination 1
03.09.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.08.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
13.07.2015 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 2
08.07.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
11.03.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Appeal 1
04.03.2015 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
11.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 1
11.06.2014 Communication of amended entries Appeal 2
01.04.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
24.02.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.02.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.02.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 9
14.02.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.02.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 11
10.02.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 11
11.10.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
08.10.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
02.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
02.10.2013 Amended description with annotations Appeal 15
02.10.2013 Amended description with annotations Appeal 15
02.10.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
02.10.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
02.10.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 13
02.10.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
02.10.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 18
02.10.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 11
02.10.2013 Claims Appeal 1
02.10.2013 Claims Appeal 1
02.10.2013 Claims Appeal 1
02.10.2013 Claims Appeal 1
02.10.2013 Claims Appeal 1
02.10.2013 Claims Appeal 1
02.10.2013 Claims Appeal 1
02.10.2013 Claims Appeal 1
02.10.2013 Claims Appeal 1
02.10.2013 Claims Appeal 1
02.10.2013 Claims Appeal 1
02.10.2013 Claims Appeal 1
02.10.2013 Claims Appeal 1
02.10.2013 Claims Appeal 1
02.10.2013 Claims Appeal 1
02.10.2013 Claims Appeal 1
02.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
02.10.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 21
30.09.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.09.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 16
30.09.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.09.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.09.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
30.09.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 13
30.09.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.09.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
30.09.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
30.09.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.09.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.09.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
30.09.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 15
30.09.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
30.09.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
30.09.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
30.09.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
27.09.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
27.09.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
27.09.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
27.09.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
27.09.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
27.09.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
27.09.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
27.09.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 32
26.09.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 32
30.07.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
29.07.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
26.07.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
25.07.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
25.07.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
24.07.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
23.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
23.07.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
25.05.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.05.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.05.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.05.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.05.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.05.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.05.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
23.05.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
23.05.2013 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 22
23.05.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 18
23.05.2013 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
23.05.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
23.05.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
23.05.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
23.05.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
23.05.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
23.05.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.05.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 4
23.05.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 16
07.05.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.03.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.03.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
21.03.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
21.03.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
21.03.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
12.03.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.03.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.03.2013 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
05.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
05.03.2013 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
05.03.2013 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
05.03.2013 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
05.03.2013 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
05.03.2013 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
05.03.2013 Claims Opposition 1
05.03.2013 Claims Opposition 1
05.03.2013 Claims Opposition 1
05.03.2013 Claims Opposition 1
05.03.2013 Claims Opposition 1
05.03.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
05.03.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
05.03.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 22
05.03.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.03.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
05.03.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 2
05.03.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.03.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 2
09.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.11.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
03.11.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
01.11.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
01.11.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
22.06.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.06.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.06.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.06.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.06.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.06.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.06.2012 Annex to a communication Opposition 6
15.06.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
15.06.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
15.06.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.06.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.12.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.12.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
23.12.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
23.12.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
23.12.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
23.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.12.2011 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 16
29.11.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.11.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
18.11.2011 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
21.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
14.09.2011 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.05.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
19.05.2011 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
13.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.05.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
06.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.04.2011 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
29.04.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.04.2011 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
22.04.2011 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
13.04.2011 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
12.04.2011 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
25.03.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
18.03.2011 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 27
18.03.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
18.03.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.03.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.03.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.03.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.03.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
18.03.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.03.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
18.03.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.03.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.03.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.03.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
16.03.2011 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 4
16.03.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 23
16.03.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
16.03.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
16.03.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
16.03.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
16.03.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.03.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.03.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.03.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
16.03.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
16.03.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
16.03.2011 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 2
20.05.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.04.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
12.04.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
12.04.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
12.02.2010 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
18.01.2010 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
28.12.2009 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
28.12.2009 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
28.12.2009 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
28.12.2009 Text intended for grant Search / examination 23
16.11.2009 Description Search / examination 5
16.11.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.11.2009 Description Search / examination 5
10.11.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 3
10.11.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.10.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
08.10.2009 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
08.10.2009 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
10.09.2009 General enquiry Search / examination 1
13.07.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
13.07.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.07.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
09.07.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.04.2009 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
23.04.2009 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
23.04.2009 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
20.04.2009 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
15.04.2009 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
15.04.2009 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
30.03.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
30.03.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 3
25.03.2009 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
23.03.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
23.03.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 3
12.03.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
07.03.2008 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
27.02.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
27.02.2008 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
27.02.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
27.08.2007 General enquiry Search / examination 1
24.08.2007 General enquiry Search / examination 1
24.08.2007 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.05.2007 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.05.2007 Request for change of representative Search / examination 18
27.02.2006 Claims Search / examination 1
27.02.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
23.02.2006 Claims Search / examination 1
23.02.2006 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 3
23.02.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
27.12.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.12.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.12.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
16.08.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
16.08.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.10.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
18.10.2004 Claims Search / examination 7
18.10.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
14.10.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 12
30.08.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
30.08.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.08.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.04.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
20.04.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.07.2003 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
07.04.2003 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
02.04.2003 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
08.10.2002 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
21.08.2002 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
05.04.2002 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
05.04.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.04.2002 European search report Search / examination 2
01.05.2001 Abstract Search / examination 1
01.05.2001 Claims Search / examination 4
01.05.2001 Description Search / examination 15
01.05.2001 Drawings Search / examination 6
01.05.2001 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
06.04.2001 Invitation to remedy deficiencies in application documents Search / examination 2
01.03.2001 Abstract Search / examination 1
01.03.2001 Claims Search / examination 4
01.03.2001 Description Search / examination 15
01.03.2001 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
01.03.2001 Drawings Search / examination 6
01.03.2001 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7