Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1245328


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.11.2017 Patent maintained (B2 publication) published on  20.12.2017 [2017/51]
17.11.2017 Change - English title published on  20.12.2017 [2017/51]
07.11.2017 New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid
04.08.2017 New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
19.07.2017 New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision
05.07.2017 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
05.07.2017 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.11.2016 Change: Date of oral proceedings
16.11.2016 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.07.2015 Change: Appeal number
19.06.2015 Change: Appeal number
02.10.2013 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
27.09.2013 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
27.09.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.10.2013  [2013/44]
02.08.2013 Change: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
26.07.2013 New entry: Appeal number
26.07.2013 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
24.07.2013 Change: Appeal number
24.07.2013 New entry: Appeal number
24.07.2013 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
22.05.2013 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
22.05.2013 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.05.2013 Change - German title published on  12.06.2013  [2013/24]
10.05.2013 Change - English title published on  12.06.2013  [2013/24]
10.05.2013 Change - French title published on  12.06.2013  [2013/24]
08.03.2013 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  10.04.2013  [2013/15]
08.06.2012 Change: Date of oral proceedings
08.06.2012 Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
24.12.2011 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.11.2011 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
17.09.2011 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
13.05.2011 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
13.05.2011 Change - representative published on  15.06.2011  [2011/24]
08.04.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.05.2011  [2011/19]
18.03.2011 Opposition filed published on  20.04.2011  [2011/16]
04.03.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.04.2011  [2011/14]
04.02.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.03.2011  [2011/10]
31.12.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.02.2011  [2011/05]
03.12.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.01.2011  [2011/01]
05.11.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.12.2010  [2010/49]
14.05.2010 (Expected) grant published on  16.06.2010  [2010/24]
23.04.2010 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
23.04.2010 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
23.03.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.02.2010 Change - applicant published on  17.03.2010  [2010/11]
15.12.2009 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.11.2009 New entry: Reply to examination report
13.11.2009 Change - divisional application(s) published on  16.12.2009  [2009/51]
30.10.2009 Change - representative published on  02.12.2009  [2009/49]
02.10.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.04.2009 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.04.2009 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.03.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.03.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.02.2008 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
25.05.2007 Change - representative published on  27.06.2007  [2007/26]
24.03.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.03.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.02.2006 New entry: Reply to examination report
20.12.2005 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.08.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.03.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.10.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
25.08.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
16.04.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
16.04.2004 First examination report published on  02.06.2004  [2004/23]
01.04.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.09.2003 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
03.09.2003 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
09.05.2003 Definitive list of designations published on  25.06.2003  [2003/26]
15.04.2003 Request for examination filed published on  28.05.2003  [2003/22]
02.04.2003 Renewal fee
16.08.2002 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.10.2002  [2002/40]