Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1245328 RSS: family dossiers
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2942410Global Dossier 11.11.2015A1
Priority number Date
EP15167985 01.03.2001
EP09175462 01.03.2001
EP01400534 01.03.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2147740Global Dossier 20.05.2015B1
EP2147740 27.01.2010A1
Priority number Date
EP09175462 01.03.2001
EP01400534 01.03.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2147740T 03.08.2015T3
Priority number Date
EP09175462 01.03.2001
EP01400534 01.03.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2541439T 20.07.2015T3
Priority number Date
EP09175462 01.03.2001
EP01400534 01.03.2001
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1245328Global Dossier 16.06.2010B1
EP1245328 02.10.2002A1
Priority number Date
EP01400534 01.03.2001
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT471224T 15.07.2010T
Priority number Date
EP01400534 01.03.2001
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE60142387D 29.07.2010D1
Priority number Date
EP01400534 01.03.2001
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2345810T 04.10.2010T3
Priority number Date
EP01400534 01.03.2001
TypeType Divisional application
 EP2147740
 EP2942410