Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1245328

Designated contracting states ATLapse: 16.06.2010
 BELapse: 16.06.2010
 CHLapse: 31.03.2011
CYLapse: 16.06.2010
 DE 
 DKLapse: 16.06.2010
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GRLapse: 17.09.2010
 IELapse: 01.03.2011
 IT 
LILapse: 31.03.2011
 LULapse: 01.03.2011
 MCLapse: 31.03.2011
 NL 
 PTLapse: 18.10.2010
 SELapse: 16.06.2010
 TRLapse: 16.06.2010
Examination procedure12.04.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
20.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
19.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
16.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
European patent granted16.06.2010
Opposition procedure04.08.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended 
Appeal following opposition23.07.2013APPEAL FILED
02.10.2013APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
25.04.2017APPEAL RESULT
25.07.2013APPEAL FILED
26.09.2013APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
25.04.2017APPEAL RESULT
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:02.10.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
 
Event date:02.10.2002 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:28.05.2003 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20030402
 
Event date:25.06.2003 
Event description:PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
 
Event date:02.06.2004 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT
Effective DATE:20040420
 
Event date:17.03.2010 
Event description:TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION
Owner Name:SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD.
 
Event date:16.06.2010 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
 
Event date:30.06.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE
 
Event date:21.07.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:29.07.2010 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:60142387
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20100729
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:22.09.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995
 
Event date:04.10.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2345810 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:29.10.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20100616
 
Event date:30.11.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20100616
 
Event date:31.12.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20100616
 
Event date:31.12.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20100917
 
Event date:28.02.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20100616
 
Event date:28.02.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20101018
 
Event date:20.04.2011 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:HERAEUS HOLDING GMBH
Effective DATE:20110316
 
Event date:29.04.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20100616
 
Event date:01.06.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R026 60142387 DE
Code Expl.:-OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT
Effective DATE:20110316
 
Event date:31.10.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20110331
 
Event date:31.10.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:04.01.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MM4A
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:31.01.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20110331
 
Event date:31.01.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20110331
 
Event date:31.01.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20110301
 
Event date:10.04.2013 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)
Opponent Name:HERAEUS HOLDING GMBH
Effective DATE:20110316
 
Event date:31.05.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20110301
 
Event date:30.09.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:TR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20100616
 
Event date:08.02.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:13.02.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20170213
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20170309
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20170221
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20170301
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20170210
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:30.06.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20170214
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:30.06.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20170320
Year of Fee Payment:17