Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1245328

EP1245328 - Use of silver an a lead-free solder paset [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/40]Lead-free solder paste
[2013/24]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.05.2010
Database last updated on 19.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2017New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD.
23 Senju-Hashido-cho Adachi-ku
Tokyo, 120-8555 / JP
[2010/11]
Former [2002/40]For all designated states
SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD.
23 Senju-Hashido-cho Adachi-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Katoh, Rikiya
6-1, Benten-cho
Sohka-shi, Saitama / JP
02 / Munekata, Osamu
2-164, Akayama-cho
Koshigaya-shi, Saitama / JP
03 / Toyoda, Yoshitaka
4-16-21, Kahinata
Satte-shi, Saitama / JP
 [2002/40]
Representative(s)Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/24]Zimmermann & Partner
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
Former [2009/49]Texier, Christian , et al
Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Former [2007/26]Texier, Christian , et al
Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR
Former [2002/40]Schrimpf, Robert , et al
Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR
Application number, filing date01400534.201.03.2001
[2002/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1245328
Date:02.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1245328
Date:16.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/24]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP05.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:B23K35/26
[2002/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/40]
TitleGerman:Verwendung von Silber in einer bleifreien Lötpaste[2013/24]
English:Use of silver an a lead-free solder paset[2013/24]
French:Usage d'Argent dans une p^te de brasage sans plomb[2013/24]
Former [2002/40]Bleifreie Lötpaste
Former [2002/40]Lead-free solder paste
Former [2002/40]Pâte à braser sans plomb
Examination procedure02.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/22]
20.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2009Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.04.2009
23.04.2009Date of oral proceedings
23.04.2009Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
08.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.2010Fee for grant paid
12.04.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP09175462.2  / EP2147740
EP15167985.9  / EP2942410
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.03.2011  23.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Heraeus Holding GmbH
Heraeusstr. 12-14
D-63450 Hanau / DE
Opponent's representative
dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/15]
Opponent(s)01  16.03.2011  23.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Heraeus Holding GmbH
Heraeusstr. 12-14
D-63450 Hanau / DE
Opponent's representative
von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2011/16]
Opponent(s)01  16.03.2011   
Heraeus Holding GmbH
Heraeusstr. 12-14
D-63450 Hanau / DE
Opponent's representative
Brand, Normen
Heraeus Holding GmbH Schutzrechte Heraeusstraße 12-14
DE-63450 Hanau / DE
19.05.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.12.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.05.2013Date of oral proceedings
23.05.2013Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.05.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.04.2017Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition23.07.2013Appeal received No.  T1634/13
02.10.2013Statement of grounds filed
25.04.2017Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
25.07.2013Appeal received No.  T1634/13
26.09.2013Statement of grounds filed
25.04.2017Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
25.04.2017Date of oral proceedings
05.07.2017Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
20.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
19.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
16.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.06.2010
BE16.06.2010
CY16.06.2010
DK16.06.2010
SE16.06.2010
TR16.06.2010
GR17.09.2010
PT18.10.2010
IE01.03.2011
LU01.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
[2013/44]
Former [2011/19]AT16.06.2010
BE16.06.2010
CY16.06.2010
DK16.06.2010
SE16.06.2010
GR17.09.2010
PT18.10.2010
Former [2011/14]AT16.06.2010
BE16.06.2010
CY16.06.2010
SE16.06.2010
GR17.09.2010
PT18.10.2010
Former [2011/10]AT16.06.2010
CY16.06.2010
SE16.06.2010
GR17.09.2010
PT18.10.2010
Former [2011/05]AT16.06.2010
CY16.06.2010
SE16.06.2010
GR17.09.2010
Former [2011/01]AT16.06.2010
SE16.06.2010
GR17.09.2010
Former [2010/49]AT16.06.2010
SE16.06.2010
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0251611  (ENGELHARD CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,10-13 * page 3, line 10 - page 3, line 54; figures 1-3 * * page 3, line 10 - page 3, line 37 * [Y] 1,8-10,17-19;
 [X]US6139979  (TAKAOKA HIDEKIYO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5,10,12,14 * table 1 *;
 [X]EP0499452  (LANCASHIRE FITTINGS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,6,7,10,15,16 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 2; table 1 *;
 [Y]JPH09327790  (UCHIHASHI ESTEC CO LTD) [Y] 1,8-10,17,18 * abstract *;
 [X]EP0710521  (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO [JP]) [X] 1,6,7,10,15,16 * figure 1; claim 1; table 1 *;
 [X]US4670217  (HENSON ROBERT M [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,10-13,15,16 * claims 1,2; table 1 *;
 [XY]WO0048784  (MULTICORE SOLDERS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-4 * claim 3 * * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 2 * [Y] 19;
 [XY]  LAINE-YLIJOKI T ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT AND VALIDATION OF A LEAD-FREE ALLOY FOR SOLDER PASTE APPLICATIONS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPONENTS, PACKAGING AND MANUFACTURING TECHNOLOGY. PART C: MANUFACTURING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19970701), vol. 20, no. 3, PART C, ISSN 1083-4400, pages 194 - 198, XP000722468 [X] 1,3,4 * column 2, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2; table 1 * [Y] 19

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/3476.649440