Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1143691

EP1143691 - System for simplifying the access and the use of internet services from a mobile terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, IE
published on 13.06.2018  [2018/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Research & Development France S.A.S.
3 Villa d'Orléans
75014 Paris / FR
[2010/38]
Former [2005/26]For all designated states
MotionBridge
33 Avenue du Maine
75015 Paris / FR
Former [2001/41]For all designated states
Speeq S.A.
33 Avenue du Maine
75015 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Marot, Emmanuel
6, Quai des Célestins
75004 Paris / FR
02 / Anquetil, Gilles
11, rue Théophile Gautier
92120 Montrouge / FR
 [2016/35]
Former [2001/41]01 / Marot, Emmanuel
demeurant 6, Quai des Célestins
75004 Paris / FR
02 / Anquetil, Gilles
demeurant 11, rue Théophile Gautier
92120 Montrouge / FR
Representative(s)Holtby, Christopher Lawrence , et al
Olswang Germany LLP
Promenadeplatz 12
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/35]Fischer, Michael Maria , et al
Olswang Germany LLP
Rosental 4
80331 München / DE
Former [2011/49]Fischer, Michael Maria , et al
Olswang Gemany LLP
Maximilianstraße 13
80539 München / DE
Former [2007/10]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Former [2007/07]Kopacz, William James
Law Offices Kopacz 129, Boulevard Saint-Germain
75006 Paris / FR
Former [2005/26]Grynwald, Albert
Cabinet Grynwald 94, rue Saint Lazare
75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date01400839.503.04.2001
[2001/41]
Priority number, dateFR2000000434205.04.2000         Original published format: FR 0004342
FR2000001232828.09.2000         Original published format: FR 0012328
[2001/41]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1143691
Date:10.10.2001
Language:FR
[2001/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1143691
Date:31.08.2016
Language:FR
[2016/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04M11/06, H04M1/247, H04M1/725, H04W4/00, G06F17/30, // H04W4/02, H04W8/26, H04W74/00, H04M1/2745
[2014/52]
Former International [2001/41]H04M11/06, H04M1/2745, G06F17/30
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2016/35]
Former [2002/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Former [2002/27]
Former [2001/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:System für die Vereinfachung des Zugriffs und des Gebrauches von Internet-Diensten mit einem mobilen Terminal[2001/41]
English:System for simplifying the access and the use of internet services from a mobile terminal[2001/41]
French:Système visant à simplifier l'accès et l'utilisation de services internet depuis un terminal mobile[2001/41]
Examination procedure16.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
30.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.07.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
21.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
12.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.01.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.05.2015Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
05.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.07.2016Fee for grant paid
22.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.11.2006
Opposition(s)01.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/32]
Request for further processing for:21.09.2007Request for further processing filed
21.09.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.11.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
12.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
08.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 15
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 16
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
17.06.2002AT   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.2002
17.06.2002BE   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.2002
17.06.2002CH   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.2002
17.06.2002CY   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.2002
17.06.2002DE   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.2002
17.06.2002DK   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.2002
17.06.2002ES   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.2002
17.06.2002FI   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.2002
17.06.2002FR   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.2002
17.06.2002GB   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.2002
17.06.2002GR   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.2002
17.06.2002IE   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.2002
17.06.2002IT   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.2002
17.06.2002LU   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.2002
17.06.2002MC   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.2002
17.06.2002NL   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.2002
17.06.2002PT   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.2002
17.06.2002SE   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.2002
17.06.2002TR   M01   Fee paid on   16.07.2002
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
17.06.2002M01   Fee paid on   16.07.2002
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200303   M06   Fee paid on   23.08.2003
30.04.200404   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.2004
30.04.200707   M06   Fee paid on   13.07.2007
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.08.2016
DK31.08.2016
ES31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
IT31.08.2016
MC31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
IE03.04.2017
LU03.04.2017
BE30.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
[2018/23]
Former [2018/13]AT31.08.2016
DK31.08.2016
ES31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
IT31.08.2016
MC31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
LU03.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
Former [2018/06]AT31.08.2016
DK31.08.2016
ES31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
IT31.08.2016
MC31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
Former [2017/38]AT31.08.2016
DK31.08.2016
ES31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
IT31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
Former [2017/12]AT31.08.2016
ES31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
GR01.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9922488  (D & I SYSTEMS INC [JP]) [X] 1-5,9 * abstract * * page 16, line 5 - line 26 * * page 28, line 20 - page 29, line 12 * * page 30, line 4 - page 31, line 20; figures 22,24 * [A] 8,8,12,13;
 [A]EP0732646  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-9 * column 15, line 37 - column 19, line 18 * * column 21, line 17 - column 22, line 28 *;
 [A]US5797098  (SCHROEDER MARTIN K [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 20 - column 7, line 54; figure 4 *
ExaminationUS5818437