Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1168024

EP1168024 - Optical fiber cable with ripcords [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.05.2007
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Draka Comteq B.V.
Boorstraat 2
1021 JZ Amsterdam / NL
[2005/39]
Former [2002/01]For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue la Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Witt, Geoff
1727A 8th St. Dr., N.E.
Hickory, North Carolina 28601 / US
02 / Shen, Steve
5141 Butner Drive
Hickory, North Carolina 28602 / US
03 / Robinson, Rick
1248 Hidden Creek Circle
Hickory, North Carolina 28602 / US
04 / Stevens, J. Boyet
5380 Courseview Drive
Mason, Ohio 45040 / US
 [2002/01]
Representative(s)Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V.
P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2005/01]Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau
P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
Former [2002/01]Cabinet Hirsch
34, Rue de Bassano
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date01401208.211.05.2001
[2002/01]
Priority number, dateUS2000059291013.06.2000         Original published format: US 592910
[2002/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1168024
Date:02.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1168024
Date:21.01.2004
[2004/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1168024
Date:28.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.12.2003
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/44
[2002/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/01]
TitleGerman:Faseroptisches Kabel mit Reissfäden[2002/01]
English:Optical fiber cable with ripcords[2002/01]
French:Câble à fibres optiques avec cordes de déchirure[2002/01]
Examination procedure21.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/38]
25.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.03.2006Fee for grant paid
15.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
17.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
12.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.06.2006
BE28.06.2006
CH28.06.2006
CY28.06.2006
FI28.06.2006
IT28.06.2006
LI28.06.2006
NL28.06.2006
TR28.06.2006
DK28.09.2006
SE28.09.2006
GR29.09.2006
PT28.11.2006
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]AT28.06.2006
BE28.06.2006
CH28.06.2006
CY28.06.2006
FI28.06.2006
IT28.06.2006
LI28.06.2006
NL28.06.2006
DK28.09.2006
SE28.09.2006
GR29.09.2006
PT28.11.2006
Former [2008/19]AT28.06.2006
BE28.06.2006
CH28.06.2006
FI28.06.2006
IT28.06.2006
LI28.06.2006
NL28.06.2006
DK28.09.2006
SE28.09.2006
GR29.09.2006
PT28.11.2006
Former [2007/36]AT28.06.2006
BE28.06.2006
CH28.06.2006
FI28.06.2006
IT28.06.2006
LI28.06.2006
NL28.06.2006
DK28.09.2006
SE28.09.2006
PT28.11.2006
Former [2007/22]AT28.06.2006
BE28.06.2006
CH28.06.2006
FI28.06.2006
LI28.06.2006
NL28.06.2006
DK28.09.2006
SE28.09.2006
PT28.11.2006
Former [2007/19]AT28.06.2006
BE28.06.2006
CH28.06.2006
FI28.06.2006
LI28.06.2006
NL28.06.2006
SE28.09.2006
PT28.11.2006
Former [2007/13]AT28.06.2006
BE28.06.2006
CH28.06.2006
FI28.06.2006
LI28.06.2006
SE28.09.2006
PT28.11.2006
Former [2007/12]AT28.06.2006
CH28.06.2006
FI28.06.2006
LI28.06.2006
SE28.09.2006
PT28.11.2006
Former [2007/09]AT28.06.2006
CH28.06.2006
FI28.06.2006
LI28.06.2006
SE28.09.2006
Former [2006/52]AT28.06.2006
FI28.06.2006
SE28.09.2006
Former [2006/51]FI28.06.2006
SE28.09.2006
Former [2006/48]SE28.09.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]US5013127  (BERNARD WERNER) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 14 - line 21; figure 2 *;
 [XA]EP0893722  (PIRELLI CABLE CORP) [X] 1 * column 5, line 47 - line 63; figure 1 * [A] 5;
 [XA]DE9003135U  (KABELMETAL ELECTRO GMBH) [X] 1-4 * page 3 - page 4; figure 1 * [A] 6