EP1161101 - Videocoding using motion prediction and filtering for block effect reduction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Assaf, Nadine 10, rue Désiré Ramelet 92700 Colombes / FR | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Fournier, Michel Robert Marie, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | Fournier, Michel Robert Marie, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propriété Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/49] | Fournier, Michel, et al Companie Financière Alcatel, DPI, 30, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01401322.1 | 21.05.2001 | [2001/49] | Priority number, date | FR20000006841 | 29.05.2000 Original published format: FR 0006841 | [2001/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1161101 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/50 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
H04N19/51 (EP,US);
H04N19/527 (EP,US);
H04N19/573 (EP,US);
H04N19/86 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/49] | Title | German: | Videokodierung mit Bewegungsprädiktion und Filter zur Verringerung von Blockartefakten | [2001/49] | English: | Videocoding using motion prediction and filtering for block effect reduction | [2001/49] | French: | Codage vidéo de source avec prédiction du movement et filtrage des effets de blocs | [2001/49] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 01.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/21] | 05.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9521503 (BRITISH BROADCASTING CORP [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0541389 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0871336 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [DA] - "TRANSMISSION OF NON-TELEPHONE SIGNALS VIDEO CODING FOR LOW BIT RATE COMMUNICATION", ITU-T H.263++ DRAFT FOR H.263++ ANNEXES U, V AND W TORECOMMENDATION H.263, XX, XX, XX, (19980127), pages 78 - 82, XP002159685 [DA] 1-10 * Annex J: Deblocking Filter mode.; page 78 - page 82 * | [DA] - "TRANSMISSION OF NON-TELEPHONE SIGNALS. VIDEO CODING FOR LOW BIT RATE COMMUNICATION", ITU-T H.263++ DRAFT FOR H.263++ ANNEXES U, V AND W TORECOMMENDATION H.263, XX, XX, XX, (19980127), pages 94 - 99, XP002159686 [DA] 1-10 * Annex N: Reference Picture Selection mode.; page 94 - page 99 * | [A] - WIEGAND T ET AL, "LONG-TERM MEMORY MOTION-COMPRENSATED PREDICTION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY,IEEE INC. NEW YORK,US, (199902), vol. 9, no. 1, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 70 - 84, XP000802288 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/76.744276 | [A] - DEKNUYDT B ET AL, "A DEBLOCKING SCHEME SUITABLE FOR USE INSIDE THE CODEC LOOP", PROCEEDINGS OF THE MEDITERRANEAN ELECTROTECHNICAL CONFERENCE,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19940412), vol. CONF. 7, ISBN 0-7803-1773-4, pages 9 - 12, XP000506090 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |