EP1160766 - Coding the expressivity in voice synthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.2006 [2006/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony France S.A. 20-26 rue Morel 92110 Clichy La Garenne / FR | [2002/02] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states Sony France S.A. 15, Rue Floréal 75831 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reck, Miranda Eduardo, c/o Sony France S.A. Computer Science Laboratory - Paris, 6, rue Amyot 75005 Paris / FR | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01401391.6 | 29.05.2001 | [2001/49] | Priority number, date | EP20000401560 | 02.06.2000 Original published format: EP 00401560 | [2001/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1160766 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1160766 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G10L13/04, G10L13/06 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
G10L13/04 (EP);
G10L13/07 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/35] |
Former [2001/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kodierung von Ausdruck in Sprachsynthese | [2001/49] | English: | Coding the expressivity in voice synthesis | [2001/49] | French: | Codage de l'expression dans une voix de synthèse | [2001/49] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 06.06.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.09.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 14.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.07.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5528726 (COOK PERRY R [US]) [X] 1,2,9-11,18 * abstract *; | [A]EP1005021 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 3-5,12-14 * abstract * | [X] - MIRANDA E.R., "a phase vocoder model of the glottis for expressive voice synthesis", 9TH SONY RESEARCH FORUM, SRF TECHNICAL DIGEST, Tokyo, (1999), pages 150 - 152, XP002172507 [X] 1-18 * the whole document * | [DXY] - COOK P., "Toward the Perfect Audio Morph? Singing Voice Synthesis and Processing", WORKSHOP ON DIGITAL AUDIO EFFECTS 98, PROCEEDINGS OF DAFX98, Barcelona, Spain, (19981119), pages 223 - 230, XP002151707 [DX] 1,2,9-11,18 * the whole document * [Y] 3-7,12-16 | [Y] - YAHAGI T ET AL, "Estimation of glottal waves based on nonminimum-phase models", INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, Database accession no. 6051709, XP002151708 [Y] 3-5,12-14 * abstract * | [ ] - ELECTRONICS AND COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART 3 (FUNDAMENTAL ELECTRONIC SCIENCE), NOV. 1998, SCRIPTA TECHNICA, USA, vol. 81, no. 11, ISSN 1042-0967, pages 56 - 66 | [Y] - VELDHUIS R ET AL, "Time-scale and pitch modifications of speech signals and resynthesis from the discrete short-time Fourier transform", SPEECH COMMUNICATION,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, (19960501), vol. 18, no. 3, ISSN 0167-6393, pages 257 - 279, XP004018610 [Y] 6,7,15,16 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-6393(95)00044-5 |