blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1168776

EP1168776 - Connector for a module of a portable telephone [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.02.2003
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.03.2003  [2003/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SAGEM S.A.
6, Avenue d'Iéna
75116 Paris / FR
[2002/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Chambon, François
c/o Sagem SA, 2, rue du Petit Albi
95800 Cergy Saint-Christophe / FR
 [2002/01]
Representative(s)Callon de Lamarck, Jean-Robert
Cabinet Regimbeau
20 Rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/01]Callon de Lamarck, Jean-Robert
Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR
Application number, filing date01401393.229.05.2001
[2002/01]
Priority number, dateFR2000000710502.06.2000         Original published format: FR 0007105
[2002/01]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1168776
Date:02.01.2002
Language:FR
[2002/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.11.2001
ClassificationIPC:H04M1/02
[2002/01]
CPC:
H04M1/0262 (EP)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2002/38]
Former [2002/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Modulsteckverbinder für ein tragbares Telefon[2002/01]
English:Connector for a module of a portable telephone[2002/01]
French:Connecteur pour module de telephone portable[2002/01]
Examination procedure03.07.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/13]
25.10.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/13]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.08.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2002TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
08.08.2002M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2339342  (NEC TECHNOLOGIES [GB]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 4, line 16 - page 9, line 9; figures 1-13 *;
 [XA]JPH10155013  ;
 [X]US5490202  (MAEKAWA HITOSHI [JP]) [X] 9,10 * abstract * * column 5, line 13 - column 6, line 53 * * figures 14-18 *;
 [X]EP0971520  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 9,10 * abstract * * column 4, line 20 - column 5, line 3 * * figures 1-9 *;
 [PX]EP1096820  (SAGEM [FR]) [PX] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10155013 A 19980609 (NEC CORP) [X] 9 * abstract * [A] 1-8,10
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.