Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1164585

EP1164585 - Changer for disk-shaped recording media [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.09.2010
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 31.08.2011  [2011/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2010/07]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Former [2009/46]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Former [2005/40]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR
Former [2001/51]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing S.A.
46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Woo, Jisung
Flat E, 8F Orchid Court, Newtown Plaza III
Shatin, N.T. / HK
 [2001/51]
Representative(s)Kurth, Dieter , et al
Deutsche Thomson OHG
Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D
30625 Hannover / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/51]Kurth, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, European Patent Operations, Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date01401479.906.06.2001
[2001/51]
Priority number, dateEP2000011277116.06.2000         Original published format: EP 00112771
[2001/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1164585
Date:19.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1164585
Date:08.01.2003
[2003/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1164585
Date:11.11.2009
Language:EN
[2009/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:G11B17/22, G11B17/30, G11B17/04
[2003/02]
Former International [2001/51]G11B17/22, G11B17/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/39]
Former [2001/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Wechsler für plattenförmiges Aufzeichnungsmedium[2001/51]
English:Changer for disk-shaped recording media[2001/51]
French:Changeur pour support d' enregistrement en forme de disque[2001/51]
Examination procedure24.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/35]
09.07.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
27.10.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
16.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.2009Fee for grant paid
29.09.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.08.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
22.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
23.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
20.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
25.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
12.08.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT11.11.2009
GB06.06.2010
FR30.06.2010
[2011/35]
Former [2011/31]IT11.11.2009
FR30.06.2010
Former [2011/14]IT11.11.2009
Documents cited:Search[XA]JPH0668583  ;
 [A]EP0845778  (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 45 - column 8, line 52; figures 1-3,4A-4C *;
 [A]JPS63200354  ;
 [A]JPH0676452  ;
 [A]EP0905686  (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) [A] 1-10 * The whole document *
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940615), vol. 018, no. 315, Database accession no. (P - 1755), [X] 1,8-10 * abstract * [A] 2-7
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881220), vol. 012, no. 488, Database accession no. (P - 803), [A] 1-10 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940622), vol. 018, no. 330, Database accession no. (P - 1758), [A] 1-10 * abstract *
ExaminationUS5781523