Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1172096

EP1172096 - Foaming cleansing composition in the form of a transparent gel [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 07.03.2007  [2007/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/03]For all designated states
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Guillou, Véronique
2 Chemin du Pont aux ânes
92160 Antony / FR
02 / Sebillotte-Arnaud Laurence
18 rue de la Bergère
94240 l'Hay-Les-Roses / FR
03 / Bordeaux, Dominique
19 rue de Villiers
91310 Longpont-sur-Orge / FR
 [2002/03]
Representative(s)Rasson, Catherine , et al
L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier
92600 Asnières / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/03]Rasson, Catherine , et al
L'OREAL-DPI 6 rue Bertrand Sincholle
92585 Clichy Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date01401834.509.07.2001
[2002/03]
Priority number, dateFR2000000911112.07.2000         Original published format: FR 0009111
[2002/03]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1172096
Date:16.01.2002
Language:FR
[2002/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1172096
Date:25.09.2002
Language:FR
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/50, A61K7/02, A61K7/00
[2002/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/03]
TitleGerman:Schäumendes Reinigungsmittel in Form eines transparenten Gels[2002/27]
English:Foaming cleansing composition in the form of a transparent gel[2002/03]
French:Composition de nettoyage moussante sous la forme d'un gel transparent[2002/03]
Former [2002/03]Schaümendes Reinigungsmittel in Form eines transparenten Gels
Examination procedure23.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/14]
04.03.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2002Fee for grant paid
18.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.09.2002
FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
IE25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
TR25.09.2002
DK25.12.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
[2007/10]
Former [2006/51]AT25.09.2002
FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
IE25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
TR25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2005/21]AT25.09.2002
FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
IE25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/42]AT25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
IE25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/31]AT25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/30]GR25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/29]GR25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/20]GR25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
Former [2003/14]SE25.12.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]US4381259  (HOMMA ITOMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * example 3; claims 1-9; table 2 *;
 [A]US5653970  (VERMEER ROBERT [US]) [A] 1-17 * examples 116,117 *;
 [A]WO9417783  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-17 * examples 19,21 *;
 [A]JPS63165477  ;
 [XP]DE19937917  (KAO CORP [JP]) [XP] 1-17 * page 2, line 15 - line 35 * * page 3, line 18 - line 45 * * page 4, line 13 - page 5, line 38; claims 1-7 *
 [A]  1, vol. 1998, no. 01, Database accession no. 1988-231723, XP002168439 [A] 1-17 * abstract *