Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP1280033


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.09.2008 Change - representative published on  29.10.2008  [2008/44]
06.04.2007 No opposition filed within time limit published on  09.05.2007  [2007/19]
14.04.2006 (Expected) grant published on  31.05.2006  [2006/22]
11.04.2006 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
11.04.2006 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
03.02.2006 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.06.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.12.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
30.07.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
27.07.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.02.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
25.02.2004 New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect
30.12.2003 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
30.12.2003 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
16.12.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.11.2003 New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit
29.08.2003 New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit
29.08.2003 Definitive list of designations published on  15.10.2003  [2003/42]
02.08.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.08.2003 First examination report
18.07.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.07.2003 Request for examination filed published on  03.09.2003  [2003/36]
21.02.2003 Change - applicant published on  09.04.2003  [2003/15]
21.02.2003 Change - representative published on  09.04.2003  [2003/15]
13.12.2002 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.01.2003  [2003/05]