Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1197934

EP1197934 - Door monitor for a gaming machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.11.2005
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WMS GAMING, INC.
800 S. Northpoint Boulevard
Waukegan, Illinois 60085 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/16]For all designated states
WMS GAMING, INC.
800 S. Northpoint Boulevard
Waukegan, Illinois 60085 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Loose, Timothy C.
4920 North Oak Park Avenue
Chicago, Illinois 60656-4030 / US
 [2002/16]
Representative(s)Maury, Richard Philip , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Maury, Richard Philip , et al
Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2005/24]Maury, Richard Philip , et al
Mark & Clerk, 90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2002/16]Loisel, Bertrand
Cabinet Plasseraud, 84, rue d'Amsterdam
75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date01402117.406.08.2001
[2002/16]
Priority number, dateUS2000069151618.10.2000         Original published format: US 691516
[2002/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1197934
Date:17.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1197934
Date:04.06.2003
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1197934
Date:19.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:G08B13/08
[2002/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB [2004/09]
Former [2002/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Türüberwachung in einem Spielautomat[2002/16]
English:Door monitor for a gaming machine[2002/16]
French:Surveillance de porte dans une machine de jeu[2002/16]
Examination procedure15.09.2003Examination requested  [2003/46]
05.12.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
25.03.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
09.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.2004Fee for grant paid
22.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.01.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES08.08.2005
[2007/09]
Documents cited:Search[A]US4845470  (BOLDT JR NORTON K [US]) [A] 1,6 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 13; figure 4 *