Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1195730

EP1195730 - Gaming machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  17.02.2012
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2012Refusal of applicationpublished on 21.03.2012  [2012/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WMS Gaming Inc
800 South Northpoint Boulevard
Waukegan, Illinois 60085 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/15]For all designated states
WMS Gaming Inc
800 South Northpoint Boulevard
Waukegan, Illinois 60085 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Joshi, Shridhar P.
7636 Kenton Avenue
Skokie, Illinois 60076 / US
02 / Locke, David K.
4213 North Richmond Street
Chicago, Illinois 60618 / US
03 / Raneses, Marc A.
1031 Huntington Drive
Elk Grove Village, Illinois 60007 / US
 [2002/15]
Representative(s)Maury, Richard Philip , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Maury, Richard Philip , et al
Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2005/24]Maury, Richard Philip , et al
Mark & Clerk, 90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2002/15]Loisel, Bertrand
Cabinet Plasseraud, 84, rue d'Amsterdam
75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date01402539.902.10.2001
[2002/15]
Priority number, dateUS2000067909304.10.2000         Original published format: US 679093
US2001092245303.08.2001         Original published format: US 922453
[2002/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1195730
Date:10.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1195730
Date:26.11.2003
[2003/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.10.2003
ClassificationInternational:G07F17/32
[2002/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB [2004/34]
Former [2002/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Spielautomat[2002/15]
English:Gaming machine[2002/15]
French:Machine de jeu[2002/15]
Examination procedure23.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/21]
27.05.2004Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
15.09.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
24.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.2011Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.11.2011
07.11.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/12]
07.11.2011Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
17.11.2011Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/12]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.10.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
12.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
13.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
11.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
11.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
30.06.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
30.06.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5959277  (LUCERO) [X] 1-72 * column 3, line 36 - line 52 * * column 11, line 64 - column 12, line 25 * * column 12, line 50 - line 64 * * claims 12,29 *;
 [A]EP0984407  (WMS GAMING) [A] 1,63 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0030] * * claims 15-21 *;
 [A]EP0984409  (WMS GAMING) [A] 1,63 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0945837  (WMS GAMING) [A] 1,63 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0062] *;
 [A]WO9919037  (CASINO DATA SYSTEMS) [A] 1,63 * page 6, line 13 - page 7, line 23 * * claim 1 *