blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1202290


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.10.2014 No opposition filed within time limit published on  12.11.2014  [2014/46]
24.01.2014 Change - inventor published on  26.02.2014  [2014/09]
01.11.2013 (Expected) grant published on  04.12.2013  [2013/49]
25.10.2013 Change - inventor published on  27.11.2013  [2013/48]
25.10.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
25.10.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
23.08.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.06.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.05.2013 Change - classification published on  19.06.2013  [2013/25]
17.05.2013 Change - classification published on  19.06.2013  [2013/25]
17.08.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.08.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.08.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.12.2009 New entry: Reply to examination report
08.10.2009 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
27.08.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.05.2009 Change - first examination report published on  01.07.2009  [2009/27]
27.05.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.11.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.10.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.08.2008 Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.02.2008 First examination report
29.02.2008 New entry: Invitation to provide information on prior art
27.02.2008 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.11.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.11.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.11.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.11.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.07.2004 New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect
04.05.2004 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
04.05.2004 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
26.03.2004 New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit
09.01.2004 Deletion: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit
09.01.2004 New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit
09.01.2004 Definitive list of designations published on  25.02.2004  [2004/09]
06.11.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.10.2003 Request for examination filed published on  17.12.2003  [2003/51]
18.04.2003 Publication of search report published on  04.06.2003  [2003/23]
18.04.2003 Change - classification published on  04.06.2003  [2003/23]
15.03.2002 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.05.2002  [2002/18]