blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1202290

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
Examination procedure23.10.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
26.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
22.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
18.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
19.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
13.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
16.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
13.01.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
European patent granted04.12.2013
Opposition procedure05.09.2014No opposition filed within time limit published on 12.11.2014 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:02.05.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
 
Event date:02.05.2002 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:04.06.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7G 21G 1/04 A
 
Event date:04.06.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7G 21B 1/00 B
 
Event date:04.06.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
 
Event date:04.06.2003 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL LT LV MK RO SI
 
Event date:17.12.2003 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20031020
 
Event date:25.02.2004 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:02.04.2008 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20080229
 
Event date:01.07.2009 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED (CORRECTED)
Effective DATE:20090602
 
Event date:10.05.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R079 60148473 DE
Code Expl.: AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS
Free Format Text:PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: G21G0001040000
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G21B0003000000
 
Event date:19.06.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G21B 3/00 20060101AFI20130510BHEP
 
Event date:19.06.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G21G 1/04 20060101ALI20130510BHEP
 
Event date:10.07.2013 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20130613
 
Event date:27.11.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:IWAMURA, YASUHIRO
 
Event date:27.11.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:SAKANO, MITSURU
 
Event date:27.11.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:ITOH, TAKEHIKO
 
Event date:04.12.2013 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:04.12.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:01.01.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 746
Code Expl.: REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)
Effective DATE:20131206
 
Event date:04.01.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R084 60148473 DE
Code Expl.: DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE
 
Event date:30.01.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 60148473 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
Effective DATE:20140130
 
Event date:26.02.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED AFTER GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:ITOH, TAKEHIKO
 
Event date:26.02.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED AFTER GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:SAKANO, MITSURU
 
Event date:26.02.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED AFTER GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:IWAMURA, YASUHIRO
 
Event date:26.02.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED AFTER GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:SAKAI, SATOSHI
 
Event date:27.02.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R084 60148473 DE
Code Expl.: DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE
Effective DATE:20140104
 
Event date:05.09.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 60148473 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
 
Event date:12.11.2014 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20140905
 
Event date:24.12.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 60148473 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
Effective DATE:20140905
 
Event date:19.09.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:18.09.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:13.09.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20180913
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20181016
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20181024
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20181018
Year of Fee Payment:18