Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1202290

EP1202290 - Nuclide transmutation device and nuclide transmutation method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.10.2014
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2014No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.11.2014  [2014/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD.
5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8315 / JP
[2013/49]
Former [2002/18]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd.
5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8315 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Iwamura, Yasuhiro
c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd.
Adv.Techn. Res. Cent.
1-8-1 Sachiura Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama, Kanagawa-ken / JP
02 / Itoh, Takehiko
c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd.
Adv.Techn. Res. Cent.
1-8-1 Sachiura Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama, Kanagawa-ken / JP
03 / Sakano, Mitsuru
c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd.
Adv.Techn. Res. Cent.
1-8-1 Sachiura Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama, Kanagawa-ken / JP
04 / Sakai, Satoshi
c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd.
Adv.Techn. Res. Cent.
1-8-1 Sachiura Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama, Kanagawa-ken / JP
 [2014/09]
Former [2013/48]01 / Iwamura, Yasuhiro
c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd.
Adv.Techn. Res. Cent.
1-8-1 Sachiura Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama, Kanagawa-ken / JP
02 / Itoh, Takehiko
c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd.
Adv.Techn. Res. Cent.
1-8-1 Sachiura Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama, Kanagawa-ken / JP
03 / Sakano, Mitsuru
c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd.
Adv.Techn. Res. Cent.
1-8-1 Sachiura Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama, Kanagawa-ken / JP
Former [2002/18]01 / Iwamura, Yasuhiro, c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd.
Adv.Techn. Res. Cent., 8-1-1 Sachiura Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama, Kanagawa-ken / JP
02 / Itoh, Takehiko, c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd.
Adv.Techn. Res. Cent., 8-1-1 Sachiura Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama, Kanagawa-ken / JP
03 / Sakano, Mitsuru, c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd.
Adv.Techn. Res. Cent., 8-1-1 Sachiura Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama, Kanagawa-ken / JP
Representative(s)Intès, Didier Gérard André , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158 rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2013/49]Intès, Didier Gérard André , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Former [2002/18]Intès, Didier Gérard André , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date01402812.030.10.2001
[2002/18]
Priority number, dateJP2000033364031.10.2000         Original published format: JP 2000333640
JP2001020187503.07.2001         Original published format: JP 2001201875
[2002/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1202290
Date:02.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1202290
Date:04.06.2003
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1202290
Date:04.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:G21B3/00, G21G1/04
[2013/25]
Former International [2003/23]G21G1/04, G21B1/00
Former International [2002/18]G21G1/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/09]
Former [2002/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Nukliden-Transmutationsvorrichtung und Nukliden-Transmutationsverfahren[2002/18]
English:Nuclide transmutation device and nuclide transmutation method[2002/18]
French:Dispositif de transmutation de nuclides et procédé de transmutation de nuclides[2002/18]
Examination procedure20.10.2003Examination requested  [2003/51]
05.12.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
30.03.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
29.02.2008Invitation to provide information on prior art
01.07.2008Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art
02.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.06.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.10.2013Fee for grant paid
23.10.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.06.2009
Opposition(s)05.09.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
26.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
22.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
18.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
19.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
13.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
16.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
13.01.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPH11231081  ;
 [Y]DE19649511  (HOEPFL REINHARD PROF DR [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4009604  (HORA HEINRICH [DE]) [A] 8 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991130), vol. 1999, no. 13, [Y] 1-11 * abstract *
 [DA]  - IWAMURA Y ET AL, "Detection of anomalous elements, X-ray, and excess heat in a D/sub 2/-Pd system and its interpretation by the electron-induced nuclear reaction model", FUSION TECHNOLOGY, JULY 1998, ANS, USA, vol. 33, no. 4, ISSN 0748-1896, pages 476 - 492, XP000779029 [DA] 1,3-5,8,9 * page 476, paragraph L - page 478, paragraph 2 * * page 490, paragraph 1 - page 492, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,18 *