Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317068

EP1317068 - Incremental-delta analogue to digital conversion [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.07.2006
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 16.05.2007  [2007/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.
6501 William Cannon Drive West
Austin, TX 78735 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/37]For all designated states
Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.
6501 William Cannon Drive West Austin
Texas 78735 / US
Former [2004/50]For all designated states
Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.
6501 William Cannon Drive West
Austin, Texas 78735 / US
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
MOTOROLA, INC.
1303 East Algonquin Road
Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Oliaei, Omid c/o Mr. Tofighi
1 Rue Vivaldi
78100 Saint Germain en Laye / FR
02 / Le Men, Bérengère
20 Rue du Pradal
31170 Toussefeuille / FR
 [2005/14]
Former [2003/23]01 / Oliaei, Omid c/o Mr. Tofighi
1 Rue Vivaldi
78100 Saint Germain en Laye / FR
02 / Le Men, Berengere
20 Rue du Pradal
31170 Toussefeuille / FR
Representative(s)Wharmby, Martin Angus
Freescale Semiconductor Inc.
c/o Impetus IP Limited
Grove House
Lutyens Close
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/27]Wharmby, Martin Angus
Freescale Semiconductor Inc. c/o Impetus IP Limited Grove House Lutyens Close
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB
Former [2003/23]Wharmby, Martin Angus
Motorola Centre de Recherche, Parc Technologique de St. Aubin, Route de L'Orme au Merisier, Immeuble Columbia
91190 Gif-sur-Yvette / FR
Application number, filing date01402821.131.10.2001
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1317068
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1317068
Date:14.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:H03M3/02
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/23]
TitleGerman:Inkrementaler Delta Analog-Digital-Wandler[2003/25]
English:Incremental-delta analogue to digital conversion[2003/23]
French:Conversion analogique-numérique du type delta-incrémental[2003/25]
Former [2003/23]Inkrementaler-Delta Analog-Digital-Wandlung
Former [2003/23]Conversion analogique-numerique du type delta-incrémental
Examination procedure04.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/06]
24.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.2005Fee for grant paid
12.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
06.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.09.2005
BE14.09.2005
CH14.09.2005
FI14.09.2005
LI14.09.2005
NL14.09.2005
TR14.09.2005
CY31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
IE01.11.2005
LU14.11.2005
DK14.12.2005
GR14.12.2005
SE14.12.2005
ES25.12.2005
PT14.02.2006
[2007/20]
Former [2007/09]AT14.09.2005
BE14.09.2005
CH14.09.2005
FI14.09.2005
LI14.09.2005
NL14.09.2005
TR14.09.2005
MC31.10.2005
IE01.11.2005
LU14.11.2005
DK14.12.2005
GR14.12.2005
SE14.12.2005
ES25.12.2005
PT14.02.2006
Former [2006/51]AT14.09.2005
BE14.09.2005
CH14.09.2005
FI14.09.2005
LI14.09.2005
NL14.09.2005
TR14.09.2005
MC31.10.2005
IE01.11.2005
DK14.12.2005
GR14.12.2005
SE14.12.2005
ES25.12.2005
PT14.02.2006
Former [2006/50]AT14.09.2005
BE14.09.2005
CH14.09.2005
FI14.09.2005
LI14.09.2005
NL14.09.2005
MC31.10.2005
IE01.11.2005
DK14.12.2005
GR14.12.2005
SE14.12.2005
ES25.12.2005
PT14.02.2006
Former [2006/48]AT14.09.2005
BE14.09.2005
CH14.09.2005
FI14.09.2005
LI14.09.2005
NL14.09.2005
MC31.10.2005
IE01.11.2005
DK14.12.2005
GR14.12.2005
SE14.12.2005
PT14.02.2006
Former [2006/34]AT14.09.2005
BE14.09.2005
CH14.09.2005
FI14.09.2005
LI14.09.2005
NL14.09.2005
MC31.10.2005
DK14.12.2005
GR14.12.2005
SE14.12.2005
PT14.02.2006
Former [2006/30]BE14.09.2005
CH14.09.2005
FI14.09.2005
LI14.09.2005
NL14.09.2005
MC31.10.2005
GR14.12.2005
SE14.12.2005
PT14.02.2006
Former [2006/25]BE14.09.2005
CH14.09.2005
FI14.09.2005
LI14.09.2005
NL14.09.2005
GR14.12.2005
SE14.12.2005
PT14.02.2006
Former [2006/22]CH14.09.2005
FI14.09.2005
LI14.09.2005
NL14.09.2005
GR14.12.2005
SE14.12.2005
Former [2006/14]CH14.09.2005
FI14.09.2005
LI14.09.2005
GR14.12.2005
SE14.12.2005
Former [2006/13]FI14.09.2005
SE14.12.2005
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5550544  (SAKIYAMA SHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,6 * column 3, line 32 - line 62; figures 1-3,7 *;
 [Y]  YUFERA A ET AL, "S2I FIRST-ORDER INCREMENTAL A/D CONVERTER", IEE PROCEEDINGS: CIRCUITS DEVICES AND SYSTEMS, INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STENVENAGE, GB, (19980401), vol. 145, no. 2, ISSN 1350-2409, pages 78 - 84, XP000785040 [Y] 1,6 * page 78, column 2, line 8 - page 79, column 1, line 1; figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/ip-cds:19981730
 [AD]  GREGORIAN R ET AL, "A continuously variable slope adaptive delta modulation codec system", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, DEC. 1983, USA, vol. SC-18, no. 6, ISSN 0018-9200, pages 692 - 700, XP001149519 [AD] 1,6 * page 693, column 2, line 2 - line 23; figures 3,6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSSC.1983.1052019