Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1319954

EP1319954 - Methods for protein analysis using protein capture arrays [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.07.2004
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.09.2004  [2004/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Consortium National de Recherche en Génomique
2, rue Gaston Crémieux
91000 Evry / FR
[2003/33]
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
Centre National de Genotypage
2, rue Gaston Crémieux
91000 Evry / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Gut, Yvo Glynne
18 rue du Moulin Vert
75014 Paris / FR
 [2003/25]
Representative(s)Warcoin, Jacques , et al
Cabinet Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]Warcoin, Jacques , et al
Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR
Application number, filing date01403216.312.12.2001
[2003/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1319954
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/68, C07K17/00
[2003/25]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/11]
Former [2003/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Proteinanalyse durch Protein bindende Arrays[2003/25]
English:Methods for protein analysis using protein capture arrays[2003/25]
French:Methodes d'analyse des protéines qui utilisent des reseaux de capture[2003/25]
Examination procedure19.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/38]
15.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
28.01.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
28.01.2004M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9939210  (MILLER SAMUEL [AU], et al) [X] 1,3-10,26 * page 43, lines 25-30; page 44, lines 23-29; page 47, lines 26-29; page 48, lines 1-7; page 50, lines 6-30; page 51, line 13 - page 52, line 15; claims 1,3,4,18-20 *;
 [X]WO0070340  (KAROLINSKA INNOVATIONS AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,3-10,26 * page 3, line 26 - page 5, line 11; page 7, lines 5-8; claims 1,2,7-10 *;
 [X]WO0118545  (JERINI BIO TOOLS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-10,15-22 * page 10, lines 10-21; page 11, line 10 - page 12, line 22; page 14, line 1 - page 15, line 25; claims 1,4,13,23,27 *;
 [X]  VON EGGELING FERDINAND ET AL, "Mass spectrometry meets chip technology: A new proteomic tool in cancer research?", ELECTROPHORESIS, (200108), vol. 22, no. 14, ISSN 0173-0835, pages 2898 - 2902, XP001069193 [X] 1,3,4,6,15-18,20-22,26 * page 2898, right-hand column, lines 10-15; page 2899, right-hand column, lines 10-43; page 2901, left-hand column, lines 4-8; page 2901, paragraph joining left- and right-hand columns *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1522-2683(200108)22:14<2898::AID-ELPS2898>3.0.CO;2-A