Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1159990

EP1159990 - Interface for a snowboard [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.01.2010
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.03.2010  [2010/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Skis Rossignol
220, rue du Pommarin
38430 Moirans / FR
[N/P]
Former [2006/34]For all designated states
SKIS ROSSIGNOL
220 Rue du Pommarin
38430 Moirans / FR
Former [2001/49]For all designated states
SKIS ROSSIGNOL S.A.
38500 Voiron / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Billon, Pierre
22, rue Genevoise
38500 Voiron / FR
02 / Restani, Eric
15, rue Paul Painlevé
38500 Voiron / FR
 [2001/49]
Representative(s)Palix, Stéphane , et al
Cabinet Laurent & Charras
"Le Contemporain"
50, Chemin de la Bruyère
69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Palix, Stéphane , et al
Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère
69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR
Former [2001/49]Palix, Stéphane , et al
Cabinet Laurent et Charras 20, rue Louis Chirpaz B.P. 32
69131 Ecully Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date01420112.317.05.2001
[2001/49]
Priority number, dateFR2000000697131.05.2000         Original published format: FR 0006971
[2001/49]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1159990
Date:05.12.2001
Language:FR
[2001/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:A63C9/00
[2001/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR [2002/35]
Former [2001/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Trägerplatte für ein Snowboard[2001/49]
English:Interface for a snowboard[2001/49]
French:Dispositif de rehaussement destiné à être monté sur une planche de glisse[2001/49]
Examination procedure28.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/15]
06.06.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.09.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
11.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.09.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/09]
14.10.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
10.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
18.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
15.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
24.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
11.07.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
11.07.2002TR   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200909   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5671939  (PINEAU DAVID G [US]) [A] 1-4 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0506064  (SALOMON SA [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 7 *;
 [A]EP0908203  (LOOK FIXATIONS SA [FR]) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 45-57 *
by applicantFR2128919
 US4022491
 US5785342
 WO8303360