Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1136829

EP1136829 - Method and apparatus for measuring the consumption of an element of an electrical network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/39]Method for measuring the consumption of an element of an electrical network
[2003/44]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.05.2005
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Watteco
Parc Tertiaire Village d'Entreprises, Bât. S
83160 La Valette du Var / FR
[2004/02]
Former [2001/39]For all designated states
Conseil en Technologies Innovantes
Parc Tertiaire, Village d'Entreprises, Bât. S
83160 La Valette du Var / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Bertrand, Paul
58, Impasse du Mas des Rochers
83200 Toulon / FR
 [2001/39]
Representative(s)Marchand, André
OMNIPAT
24 Place des Martyrs de la Résistance
13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/39]Marchand, André
OMNIPAT, 24 Place des Martyrs de la Résistance
13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR
Application number, filing date01430011.522.03.2001
[2001/39]
Priority number, dateFR2000000362022.03.2000         Original published format: FR 0003620
[2001/39]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1136829
Date:26.09.2001
Language:FR
[2001/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1136829
Date:14.07.2004
Language:FR
[2004/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:G01R21/133
[2001/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/24]
Former [2001/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Messen des Verbrauchs eines Elementes in einem Elektrizitätsnetz[2003/44]
English:Method and apparatus for measuring the consumption of an element of an electrical network[2003/44]
French:Procédé et dispositif de mesure de la consommation électrique d'un élément connecté a un réseau de distribution d'électricité[2003/44]
Former [2001/39]Messverfahren für den Verbrauch eines Elementes in einem Elektrizitätsnetz
Former [2001/39]Method for measuring the consumption of an element of an electrical network
Former [2001/39]Procédé de mesure de la consommation électrique d'un élément connecté a un réseau de distribution d'électricité
Examination procedure14.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/17]
01.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.01.2004Fee for grant paid
16.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
03.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200404   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2004
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI14.07.2004
IE14.07.2004
NL14.07.2004
TR14.07.2004
DK14.10.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
PT14.12.2004
CY22.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/20]FI14.07.2004
IE14.07.2004
NL14.07.2004
TR14.07.2004
DK14.10.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
CY22.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/51]FI14.07.2004
IE14.07.2004
NL14.07.2004
TR14.07.2004
DK14.10.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/23]FI14.07.2004
IE14.07.2004
NL14.07.2004
DK14.10.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/14]FI14.07.2004
IE14.07.2004
DK14.10.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
MC31.03.2005
Former [2005/24]FI14.07.2004
IE14.07.2004
DK14.10.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
Former [2005/22]FI14.07.2004
DK14.10.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
Former [2005/18]FI14.07.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
Former [2005/11]FI14.07.2004
SE14.10.2004
Former [2005/10]SE14.10.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]US5483153  (MIT) [X] 1-15 * claims 1-34 *;
 [X]FR2680875  (SERVICES INDUSTRIELS DE GENEVE) [X] 1-5,8 * claims 1-9 *;
 [X]US4858141  (HART ET AL.) [X] 1-5,8 * figures 1,21,8 *