blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1142612

EP1142612 - Gymnastic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.06.2006
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip23.06.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.07.2006  [2006/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Multi'Form
Lieudit Grand Pont
13640 La Roque D'Antheron / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/41]For all designated states
Multi Form
Lieudit Grand Pont
13640 La Roque D'Antheron / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Minguet, Yves
Chemin du Grand Saint-Paul
13840 Rognes / FR
 [2001/41]
Representative(s)Domange, Maxime, et al
Cabinet Beau de Lomenie
Tour Méditerranée
65 avenue Jules Cantini
13006 Marseille / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/41]Domange, Maxime, et al
Cabinet Beau de Lomenie, 232, avenue du Prado
13295 Marseille Cedex 08 / FR
Application number, filing date01430013.103.04.2001
[2001/41]
Priority number, dateFR2000000454006.04.2000         Original published format: FR 0004540
[2001/41]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1142612
Date:10.10.2001
Language:FR
[2001/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.2001
ClassificationIPC:A63B21/062
[2001/41]
CPC:
A63B21/00181 (EP); A63B21/0628 (EP); A63B21/0783 (EP);
A63B21/00058 (EP); A63B21/0085 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [2002/27]
Former [2001/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Gymnastikgerät[2001/41]
English:Gymnastic apparatus[2001/41]
French:Appareil de gymnastique[2001/41]
Examination procedure28.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/19]
11.04.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
31.07.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
15.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.01.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/30]
24.02.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
04.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.05.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
16.05.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
16.05.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
16.05.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
16.05.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
16.05.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
16.05.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
16.05.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
16.05.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
16.05.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
16.05.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
16.05.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
16.05.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
16.05.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
16.05.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
16.05.2002TR   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200606   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5147263  (MUELLER KING L [US]) [X] 1,2,8,9,11,12 * column 2, line 8 - column 3, line 28; figures 1-3 * [A] 5-7;
 [XA]EP0678312  (KALLIOS DEMETRIOS [US]) [X] 1,3,4,8,11,12 * column 1, line 18 - column 4, line 5; figures 1-4 * [A] 2,7;
 [XA]US4765610  (SIDWELL DAVID A [US]) [X] 1,2,9-12 * column 2, line 18 - column 4, line 14; figures 1-4 * [A] 4,7;
 [XA]WO9952600  (MATTIUZZO LEANDRO [IT], et al) [X] 1,9,11,12 * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 22 * * page 2, line 31 - page 4, line 17; figures 1-6 * [A] 4-8
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.