EP1241692 - Locking device with a padlock for a modular electrical apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hager Electro Boulevard d'Europe 67215 Obernai / FR | [2002/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bournarie, Christophe 7D, rue du Petit Rempart 67230 Benfeld / FR | 02 /
Lienhardt, Thierry 7, rue de Mulhouse 67100 Strasbourg / FR | 03 /
Rustenholz, Daniel 158b, rue d'Altorf 67120 Dachstein / FR | 04 /
Diebold, Francis 1, rue du Lavoir 67210 Bernardswiller / FR | 05 /
Cathala, François 123, rue Principale 67230 Westhouse / FR | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | Littolff, Denis Meyer & Partenaires 2 rue de Dublin 67300 Schiltigheim / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | Littolff, Denis Meyer & Partenaires, Conseils en Propriété Industrielle, Bureaux Europe, 20, place des Halles 67000 Strasbourg / FR | Application number, filing date | 01440066.7 | 12.03.2001 | [2002/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1241692 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1241692 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/28 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
H01H9/282 (EP);
H01H71/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/38] | Title | German: | Abschliessvorrichtung mit Vorhängeschloss für ein modulares elektrisches Gerät | [2002/38] | English: | Locking device with a padlock for a modular electrical apparatus | [2002/38] | French: | Dispositif de cadenassage d'un appareil électrique modulaire | [2002/38] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/43] | 31.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.03.2011 | CY | 02.03.2011 | DK | 02.03.2011 | FI | 02.03.2011 | IE | 02.03.2011 | IT | 02.03.2011 | NL | 02.03.2011 | SE | 02.03.2011 | TR | 02.03.2011 | LU | 12.03.2011 | BE | 31.03.2011 | CH | 31.03.2011 | LI | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | GB | 02.06.2011 | GR | 03.06.2011 | ES | 13.06.2011 | PT | 04.07.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
IT | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
LU | 12.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
GB | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
IT | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
GB | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
IT | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | SE | 02.03.2011 | |
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3821532 (ISAAC D, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 39 - line 46; figure 1 *; | [A]DE9100730U (KLÖCKNER-MOELLER) [A] 1 * figures 1,4; claim 1 *; | [A]US5302925 (CASTONGUAY ROGER N [US], et al); | [X]WO0108180 (BRUCHMANN KLAUS [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 8, paragraph L - page 10, paragraph 2; figure 3 * | by applicant | WO0108180 |