blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1241692

EP1241692 - Locking device with a padlock for a modular electrical apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.01.2012
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 30.10.2013  [2013/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hager Electro
Boulevard d'Europe
67215 Obernai / FR
[2002/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Bournarie, Christophe
7D, rue du Petit Rempart
67230 Benfeld / FR
02 / Lienhardt, Thierry
7, rue de Mulhouse
67100 Strasbourg / FR
03 / Rustenholz, Daniel
158b, rue d'Altorf
67120 Dachstein / FR
04 / Diebold, Francis
1, rue du Lavoir
67210 Bernardswiller / FR
05 / Cathala, François
123, rue Principale
67230 Westhouse / FR
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Littolff, Denis
Meyer & Partenaires
2 rue de Dublin
67300 Schiltigheim / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Littolff, Denis
Meyer & Partenaires, Conseils en Propriété Industrielle, Bureaux Europe, 20, place des Halles
67000 Strasbourg / FR
Application number, filing date01440066.712.03.2001
[2002/38]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1241692
Date:18.09.2002
Language:FR
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1241692
Date:02.03.2011
Language:FR
[2011/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.08.2001
ClassificationIPC:H01H9/28
[2002/38]
CPC:
H01H9/282 (EP); H01H71/52 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/38]
TitleGerman:Abschliessvorrichtung mit Vorhängeschloss für ein modulares elektrisches Gerät[2002/38]
English:Locking device with a padlock for a modular electrical apparatus[2002/38]
French:Dispositif de cadenassage d'un appareil électrique modulaire[2002/38]
Examination procedure24.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/43]
31.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2011Fee for grant paid
07.01.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.12.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2012/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
24.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
18.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
19.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
DK02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
IE02.03.2011
IT02.03.2011
NL02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
TR02.03.2011
LU12.03.2011
BE31.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
GB02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
PT04.07.2011
[2013/44]
Former [2013/25]AT02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
DK02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
IE02.03.2011
IT02.03.2011
NL02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
LU12.03.2011
BE31.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
GB02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
PT04.07.2011
Former [2012/30]AT02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
DK02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
IE02.03.2011
IT02.03.2011
NL02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
BE31.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
GB02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
PT04.07.2011
Former [2012/23]AT02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
DK02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
IE02.03.2011
IT02.03.2011
NL02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
BE31.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
PT04.07.2011
Former [2012/10]AT02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
DK02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
IE02.03.2011
NL02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
BE31.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
PT04.07.2011
Former [2012/07]AT02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
IE02.03.2011
NL02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
BE31.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
PT04.07.2011
Former [2012/05]AT02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
IE02.03.2011
NL02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
BE31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
PT04.07.2011
Former [2011/47]AT02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
IE02.03.2011
NL02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
PT04.07.2011
Former [2011/39]AT02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
NL02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
Former [2011/37]CY02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
Former [2011/36]SE02.03.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
Documents cited:Search[A]US3821532  (ISAAC D, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 39 - line 46; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE9100730U  (KLÖCKNER-MOELLER) [A] 1 * figures 1,4; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5302925  (CASTONGUAY ROGER N [US], et al);
 [X]WO0108180  (BRUCHMANN KLAUS [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 8, paragraph L - page 10, paragraph 2; figure 3 *
by applicantWO0108180
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.