Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1180883

EP1180883 - Distributed source learning for data communication switch [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.01.2010
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
54, rue la Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2007/14]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
54 rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2002/08]For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Hill, Rex A.
14360 Janal Way
San Diego, CA 92129 / US
02 / Bailey, John
5940 Grey Rock
Agoura Hills, CA 91301 / US
03 / Dietz, Bryan A.
24092 Brookfield Circle
Lake Forest, CA 92630 / US
 [2002/08]
Representative(s)Schmidt, Werner Karl , et al
Alcatel Lucent
Intellectual Property & Standards
70430 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/04]Schmidt, Werner Karl , et al
Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards
70430 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2002/08]Wörz, Volker
Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date01440255.606.08.2001
[2002/08]
Priority number, dateUS2000063958916.08.2000         Original published format: US 639589
[2002/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1180883
Date:20.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1180883
Date:08.09.2004
[2004/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1180883
Date:25.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/56
[2002/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/08]
TitleGerman:Verteiltes Lernen von Quellen für eine Datenübertragungsvermittlungsstel[2008/50]
English:Distributed source learning for data communication switch[2002/08]
French:Procédé d'apprentissage de sources pour un commutateur de communication de données[2002/08]
Former [2002/08]Lernendes Verfahren von Quellen für eine Datenübertragungsvermittlungsstelle
Examination procedure07.03.2005Examination requested  [2005/18]
22.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
06.06.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
13.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.02.2009Fee for grant paid
11.02.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.12.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09]
Request for further processing for:13.06.2006Request for further processing filed
13.06.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.06.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
04.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
18.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
19.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.03.2009
BE25.03.2009
CY25.03.2009
DK25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
IT25.03.2009
NL25.03.2009
TR25.03.2009
SE25.06.2009
GR26.06.2009
ES06.07.2009
IE06.08.2009
LU06.08.2009
CH31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
PT31.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/21]AT25.03.2009
BE25.03.2009
DK25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
IT25.03.2009
NL25.03.2009
SE25.06.2009
GR26.06.2009
ES06.07.2009
IE06.08.2009
LU06.08.2009
CH31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
PT31.08.2009
Former [2011/14]AT25.03.2009
BE25.03.2009
DK25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
IT25.03.2009
NL25.03.2009
SE25.06.2009
GR26.06.2009
ES06.07.2009
IE06.08.2009
CH31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
PT31.08.2009
Former [2010/47]AT25.03.2009
BE25.03.2009
DK25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
NL25.03.2009
SE25.06.2009
GR26.06.2009
ES06.07.2009
IE06.08.2009
CH31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
PT31.08.2009
Former [2010/35]AT25.03.2009
BE25.03.2009
DK25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
NL25.03.2009
SE25.06.2009
ES06.07.2009
IE06.08.2009
CH31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
PT31.08.2009
Former [2010/21]AT25.03.2009
BE25.03.2009
DK25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
NL25.03.2009
SE25.06.2009
ES06.07.2009
CH31.08.2009
LI31.08.2009
MC31.08.2009
PT31.08.2009
Former [2010/16]AT25.03.2009
BE25.03.2009
DK25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
NL25.03.2009
SE25.06.2009
ES06.07.2009
MC31.08.2009
PT31.08.2009
Former [2010/08]AT25.03.2009
BE25.03.2009
DK25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
NL25.03.2009
SE25.06.2009
ES06.07.2009
PT31.08.2009
Former [2009/50]AT25.03.2009
BE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
NL25.03.2009
SE25.06.2009
ES06.07.2009
PT31.08.2009
Former [2009/49]AT25.03.2009
BE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
SE25.06.2009
ES06.07.2009
PT31.08.2009
Former [2009/46]AT25.03.2009
BE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
SE25.06.2009
ES06.07.2009
Former [2009/43]AT25.03.2009
BE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
SE25.06.2009
Former [2009/40]AT25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
SE25.06.2009
Former [2009/37]FI25.03.2009
SE25.06.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0993156  (CIT ALCATEL) [X] 1-64 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 55 * * column 4, line 28 - column 5, line 27 * * column 8, line 3 - column 8, line 49 * * column 10, line 31 - column 12, line 14 *;
 [X]WO9900945  (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC) [X] 1-64 * page 10, line 1 - page 14, line 3 * * page 20, line 18 - page 22, line 23 *;
 [X]EP0887970  (COMPAQ COMPUTER CORP) [X] 1,4,61 * page 1, line 4 - page 14, line 46 *;
 [A]US6101188  (SEKINE MINORU ET AL) [A] 1-64 * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 26 * * column 6, line 44 - column 7, line 33 * * column 12, line 13 - column 13, line 43 * * figures 3,10 *