EP1162153 - Dispensing container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.08.2003 [2003/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plastoform, S.A. 11-12, calle Maresme - P.I. Palaudaries 08185 Llica de Vall / ES | [2001/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Quiroga Rodriguez, José Manuel 11-12 calle Manresa - P.I. Palaudaries 08185 Llica de Vall / ES | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Sugrañes, S.L.P. Calle Provenza 304 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | SUGRANES - VERDONCES - FERREGÜELA Calle Provenza, 304 08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 01500118.3 | 09.05.2001 | [2001/50] | Priority number, date | ES20000001283U | 16.05.2000 Original published format: ES 200001283 U | [2001/50] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1162153 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65D35/08 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
B65D35/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2002/36] |
Former [2001/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Ausgabebehälter | [2001/50] | English: | Dispensing container | [2001/50] | French: | Contenant distributeur | [2001/50] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/34] | 19.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.09.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.09.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]FR2792615 (CEP IND [FR]) [PX] 1 * page 3, line 19 - line 31; figure 1 *; | [X]GB2307901 (METAL BOX PLC [GB]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 11 - line 19; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE19730309 (BAERTLE WERNER [DE], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 26; figure 2 * |