Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1241542

EP1241542 - Watch-case for a wristwatch or a pocket watch [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.02.2010
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.02.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.03.2010  [2010/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VACUUM CHRONOMETER CORPORATION
Zihlstrasse 50
2560 Nidau / CH
[2002/42]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
Century Time Gems Ltd
Zihlstrasse 50
2560 Nidau / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Klingenberg, Hans-Ulrich
Zihlstrasse 48
2560 Nidau / CH
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)BOVARD AG
Patent- und Markenanwälte
Optingenstrasse 16
3013 Bern / CH
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]BOVARD AG - Patentanwälte
Optingenstrasse 16
3000 Bern 25 / CH
Application number, filing date01810259.014.03.2001
[2002/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1241542
Date:18.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:G04B37/18, G04B37/22
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/38]
TitleGerman:Uhrengehäuse für eine Armband- oder Taschenuhr[2002/38]
English:Watch-case for a wristwatch or a pocket watch[2002/38]
French:Boîtier pour montre-bracelet ou montre de poche[2002/38]
Examination procedure04.10.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/17]
17.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/12]
06.11.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2010/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
25.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
24.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
25.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200505   M06   Fee paid on   13.05.2005
31.03.200909   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4967402  (CLAUDE GEORGES [CH]) [X] 1,3 * column A; figure 1 *;
 [XA]US4034552  (DAVIDSON CHARLES) [X] 1,3 * column A; figure 5 * [A] 2;
 [A]CH388199  (LANG LOUIS SA [CH]) [A] 1,2,4 * page 2, line 34 - line 88; figure - *;
 [A]US5490123  (BIVER JEAN-CLAUDE [CH]) [A] 1,5 * column 4, line 4 - line 7; figure 4 *;
 [A]CH187745  (MORF ERNEST [CH]) [A] 1,3,6 * figure - *;
 [A]US4692033  (MOCK ELMAR [CH], et al) [A] 1,3,7 * figure - *
by applicantCH647376