Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1243985

EP1243985 - Clockwork [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.11.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.01.2004  [2004/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wiederrecht, Jean-Marc
40 Chemin du Guillon
1233 Bernex / CH
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
Wiederrecht, Jean-Marc
40 Chemin Guillon
1233 Bernex / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Wiedderecht, Jean-Marc
40, chemin du Guillon
1233 Bernex / CH
02 / Bouvier, Saskia
72, route de Bellegarde
1284 Chancy / CH
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Gresset, Jean
GLN S.A.
Gresset & Laesser Neuchâtel
Puits-Godet 8a
2000 Neuchâtel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]Gresset, Jean
Gresset - Laesser Cabinet de Conseils en propriété industrielle, 8A, Puits-Godet
2000 Neuchâtel / CH
Application number, filing date01810282.220.03.2001
[2002/39]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1243985
Date:25.09.2002
Language:FR
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:G04B47/06, G04B47/04, G04B19/24, G04B45/04, G04B33/02, G04B19/04
[2002/39]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/24]
Former [2002/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Uhrwerk[2002/39]
English:Clockwork[2002/39]
French:Mouvement de montre[2002/39]
Examination procedure26.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/01]
23.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/01]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
06.05.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
06.05.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAY]US1949024  (RAPHAEL MELIK-MINASSIANTZ) [X] 1,4,7-9 * page 1, column 1, line 42 - line 52 * * page 2, column 1, line 2 - line 25 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 2,3,5,10 [Y] 12;
 [YA]FR2713790  (ANDOLFI GIANCARLO [IT]) [Y] 1,3,7-9,12 * page 3, line 6 - line 29 * * page 5, line 37 - page 6, line 5 * * page 6, line 29 - line 36 * * figures 1,3,5,6 * [A] 2,5,10,11;
 [Y]GB2162663  (HUI DAVID) [Y] 1,3,7-9,12 * abstract * * page 2, line 101 - line 108 * * page 3, line 27 - line 34 * * figures 5,8,18,19 *
by applicantWO9935542
 EP0681227
 CH310559