Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1258852

EP1258852 - Method for identifying packages of graphic products [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.05.2009
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.05.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.06.2009  [2009/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GRAPHA-HOLDING AG
Sonnenbergstrasse 13
6052 Hergiswil / CH
[2008/27]
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
Grapha-Holding AG
Sonnenbergstrasse 13
6052 Hergiswil / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Merkli, Peter, Dr.
Langernweg 8
4665 Oftringen / CH
 [2002/47]
Application number, filing date01810467.914.05.2001
[2002/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1258852
Date:20.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1258852
Date:02.07.2008
Language:DE
[2008/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:G09F3/02, G09F13/22
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2003/32]
Former [2002/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Kennzeichnung von Gebinden der graphischen Weiterverarbeitung[2002/47]
English:Method for identifying packages of graphic products[2002/47]
French:Méthode d'identification de paquets de produits graphiques[2002/47]
Examination procedure18.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/16]
28.02.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2008Fee for grant paid
09.05.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.04.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
17.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
18.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
29.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
16.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1033695  (NCR INT INC [US]) [Y] 1-8,10-14 * abstract *;
 [Y]US4329191  (BARBER DONALD T) [Y] 1-4,10-12 * abstract *;
 [Y]JP2001015264  ;
 [A]JPH11144544  ;
 [A]US6042149  (ROSHKOFF KENNETH S [US]);
 [A]EP1014141  (XEROX CORP [US])
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010508), vol. 2000, no. 16, [Y] 5-8,10-14 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990831), vol. 1999, no. 10, [A] * abstract *