Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1316858

EP1316858 - Date mechanism for timepiece [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.11.2008
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROLEX SA
3-5-7 rue François Dussaud
1211 Genève 24 / CH
[2003/23]
Inventor(s)01 / Gabathuler, Jacques
14, avenue Georges-Werner
1231 Conches / CH
02 / Jacot, Cédric
23, avenue Marcelin
1110 Morges / CH
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Savoye, Jean-Paul , et al
Moinas & Savoye S.A.
42, rue Plantamour
1201 Genève / CH
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Savoye, Jean-Paul , et al
Moinas & Savoye S.A., 42, rue Plantamour
1201 Genève / CH
Application number, filing date01811165.830.11.2001
[2003/23]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1316858
Date:04.06.2003
Language:FR
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1316858
Date:23.01.2008
Language:FR
[2008/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:G04B19/24
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2004/09]
Former [2003/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kalendermechanismus für eine Uhr[2003/23]
English:Date mechanism for timepiece[2003/23]
French:Mecanisme de quantième de pièce d'horlogerie[2003/23]
Examination procedure10.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/37]
07.10.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
02.04.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
14.07.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.01.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
10.04.2007Fee for grant paid
10.04.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.10.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01]
Request for further processing for:17.02.2007Request for further processing filed
10.04.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.12.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
10.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
28.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
14.01.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
14.01.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200606   M06   Fee paid on   10.04.2007
Documents cited:Search[A]DE1523777  (HETZEL FRANZ) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB718896  (BORIS ELBERG) [A] 1 * the whole document *