Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1239654

EP1239654 - An image capturing device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.05.2006
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.05.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.06.2006  [2006/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Universita' degli studi di Bologna
Via Zamboni, 33
40126 Bologna / IT
[2002/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Casali, Franco
Via Zoccoli, 9
40134 Bologna / IT
02 / Morigi, Maria Pia
Via G. Matteotti, 18
48020 S. Agata sul Santerno, Ravenna / IT
03 / Rossi, Massimo
Via Pozzo Nuovo, 7
61029 Urbino, Pesaro / IT
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Lanzoni, Luciano
Bugnion S.p.A.
Via di Corticella, 87
40128 Bologna / IT
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]Lanzoni, Luciano
c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via Goito, 18
40126 Bologna / IT
Application number, filing date01830140.828.02.2001
[2002/37]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1239654
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/028
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/37]
TitleGerman:Bildaufnahmevorrichtung[2002/37]
English:An image capturing device[2002/37]
French:Dispositif de capture d'image[2002/37]
Examination procedure07.12.2001Examination requested  [2002/37]
14.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.01.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/25]
08.02.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200606   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YA]US3786181  (PEAR C) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-19;
 [YA]US4829180  (GOTO CHIAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * column 5, line 26 - line 31; figure 1 * [A] 2-19;
 [A]US5017781  (LANGE GOTTFRIED [DE], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 54 *;
 [A]US5216738  (FEDER PERETZ M [US]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]  KEN-ICHI HASEGAWA ET AL, "IMAGING SYSTEM WITH AN AMORPHOUS SILICON LINEAR SENSOR", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, (19890701), vol. 60, no. 7, PART 2B, ISSN 0034-6748, pages 2284 - 2286, XP000038352 [A] 1-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1140794