Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1258723

EP1258723 - Non destructive process for continuously measuring the density profile of panels [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.05.2006
Database last updated on 18.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.05.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.06.2006  [2006/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IMAL S.r.l
Via Rosalba Carriera, 63
41010 San Damaso (MO) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
Imal S.R.L.
Via Rosalba Carriera 63
41010 San Damaso, Modena / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Benedetti, Paolo
Via Fossoli 78
41100 Modena MO / IT
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)Celestino, Marco
ABM Agenzia Brevetti & Marchi, Viale Giovanni Pisano, 31
56123 Pisa / IT
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]Celestino, Marco
ABM, Agenzia Brevetti & Marchi, Viale Giovanni Pisano, 31
56123 Pisa / IT
Application number, filing date01830321.418.05.2001
[2002/47]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1258723
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/47]
Type: A9 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP1258723
Date:19.02.2003
[2003/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:G01N23/20
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/47]
TitleGerman:Nichtzerstörendes Verfahren zum kontinuierlischen Messen des Dichteprofils von Platten[2002/47]
English:Non destructive process for continuously measuring the density profile of panels[2002/47]
French:Procédé non destructif de mesure en continu du profilé en densité de paneaux[2002/47]
Examination procedure24.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/21]
01.12.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/23]
09.01.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200505   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2997586  (SCHERBATSKOY SERGE A) [X] 1-6,8-12,14 * column 2; figures 1,2 *;
 [DA]US5195117  (ONG POEN S [US]) [DA] 1 * abstract *;
 [DA]US5970116  (DUEHOLM STEN [DK], et al) [DA] 1 * abstract *;
 [DA]US4228351  (SNOW SAMUEL G, et al) [DA] 1 * abstract *