blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1192921

EP1192921 - A method for making absorbent articles and an absorbent article obtained using this method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 10.09.2008  [2008/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GDM S.p.A.
Via Battindarno, 91
40133 Bologna / IT
[2006/28]
Former [2002/14]For all designated states
GDM S.p.A.
Via Segantini, 29
40133 Bologna / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Malpensi, Claudio
Piazza de Calderini, 2
40124 Bologna / IT
02 / Gandini, Mario
Piazza Esquilino, 9
20148 Milano / IT
 [2002/14]
Representative(s)Lanzoni, Luciano
Bugnion S.p.A.
Via di Corticella, 87
40128 Bologna / IT
[N/P]
Former [2002/14]Lanzoni, Luciano
c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via Goito, 18
40126 Bologna / IT
Application number, filing date01830616.728.09.2001
[2002/14]
Priority number, dateIT2005BO0006902.10.2000         Original published format: IT BO200569
[2002/14]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1192921
Date:03.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1192921
Date:14.01.2004
[2004/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1192921
Date:24.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.11.2003
ClassificationIPC:A61F13/15, A61F13/534
[2002/14]
CPC:
A61F13/534 (EP,US); A61F13/15634 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/14]
TitleGerman:Ein Herstellungsverfahren von absorbierenden Artikeln und ein absorbierender Artikel, der mit Hilfe dieses Verfahrens hergestellt wird[2002/14]
English:A method for making absorbent articles and an absorbent article obtained using this method[2002/14]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'articles absorbants et article absorbant produit par ce procédé[2002/14]
Examination procedure03.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/19]
29.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
13.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.01.2006Fee for grant paid
23.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.02.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY28.09.2006
LU28.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
[2008/37]
Former [2007/45]CY28.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2007/37]IT24.05.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2007/36]IT24.05.2006
Documents cited:Search[XY]FR2430734  (SUPER IRIDE SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2,8-10,16 * page 1, line 34 - page 2, line 24 * * page 3, line 3 - page 3, line 20; figures 1-4; claims 1-6 * [Y] 3-7,11-15;
 [AD]US5064484  (CRAIG GRANTLAND A [US], et al) [AD] 1-16* the whole document *;
 [Y]US5730737  (WIDLUND URBAN [SE], et al) [Y] 3-7,11-15 * column 9, line 50 - column 11, line 7; figures 10,11 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.