EP1164795 - Logging of events [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 02150 Espoo / FI | [2001/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niklasson, Martin Björnkärrgatan 15A:11 584 36 Linköping / SE | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Estreen, Lars J.F., et al Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | Estreen, Lars, et al Kransell & Wennborg AB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 01850101.5 | 12.06.2001 | [2001/51] | Priority number, date | SE20000002235 | 15.06.2000 Original published format: SE 0002235 | [2001/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1164795 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1164795 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/16, H04N7/173 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
H04N21/8455 (EP,US);
H04H60/31 (EP,US);
H04N21/44008 (EP,US);
H04N21/4756 (EP,US);
H04N21/812 (EP,US);
H04N7/17345 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/03] |
Former [2001/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Registrierung von Ereignissen | [2001/51] | English: | Logging of events | [2001/51] | French: | Enregistrement d'évènements | [2001/51] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 20.03.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9638985 (PALMER SHELTON LEIGH [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 1, line 36 - page 2, line 35 *; | [A]WO9921338 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 5, line 26 - line 37 *; | [A]EP0402809 (MAGUS LTD [KY]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US5636346 (SAXE ANDREW N G [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]US5600364 (HENDRICKS JOHN S [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |