Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1321635

EP1321635 - Oil drainage passage for an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.09.2004
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.10.2004  [2004/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, Inc.
Suite 911, Parklane Towers East, One Parkland Boulevard
Dearborn, MI 48126 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, Inc.
Suite 911, Parklane Towers East, One Parkland Boulevard
Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rengmyr, Staffan
Brikagatan 39A
416 56 Göterborg / SE
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Hellbom, Lars Olof , et al
Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]Hellbom, Lars Olof , et al
Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date01850221.121.12.2001
[2003/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1321635
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:F01M1/00, F01M13/00
[2003/26]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/12]
Former [2003/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Oelruckführungsleitung in einer Brennkraftmaschine[2003/26]
English:Oil drainage passage for an internal combustion engine[2003/26]
French:Conduit pour le drainage de l'huile dans un moteur à combustion interne[2003/26]
Examination procedure30.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/43]
27.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/43]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
06.02.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
06.02.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
06.02.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
06.02.2004M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5852992  (BOGGS DAVID LEE [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * column 1, line 19 - column 2, line 46; figure 2 * * figure 2 * [Y] 5;
 [X]EP0240120  (AUSTIN ROVER GROUP [GB]) [X] 1-4,6 * page 4; figure 1 *;
 [X]US5727512  (HUTCHINS WILLIAM RICHARD [GB]) [X] 1-3,6 * column 2, line 22 - column 2, line 57; figure 1 *;
 [Y]GB2172061  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 5 * page 3; figures 1,3 *